EP2319572 - Ergonomic and adjustable respiratory mask assembly with headgear assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ResMed Limited 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, NSW 2153 / AU | [2014/27] |
Former [2011/19] | For all designated states ResMed Limited 97 Waterloo Road, North Ryde New South Wales 2113 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ging, Anthony M. c/o ResMed Ltd. 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive NSW 2153 Bella Vista / AU | 02 /
Nasr, Saad c/o ResMed Ltd. 1 Elizabeth Drive NSW 2153 Bella Vista / AU | [2014/27] |
Former [2011/30] | 01 /
Ging, Anthony M. c/o ResMed Ltd. , 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive NSW 2153 Bella Vista / AU | ||
02 /
Nasr, Saad c/o ResMed Ltd. 1 Elizabeth Drive NSW 2153 Bella Vista / AU | |||
Former [2011/19] | 01 /
Ging, Anthony M. c/o ResMed Ltd. 97 Waterloo Road North Ryde, New South Wales 2113 / AU | ||
02 /
Nasr, Saad c/o ResMed Ltd. 97 Waterloo Road North Ryde, New South Wales 2113 / AU | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/19] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10184934.7 | 23.04.2003 | [2011/19] | Priority number, date | AU2002PS01926 | 23.04.2002 Original published format: AU PS192602 | US20020377254P | 03.05.2002 Original published format: US 377254 P | US20020397195 | 22.07.2002 Original published format: US 397195 | US20020402509 | 12.08.2002 Original published format: US 402509 | US20030390681 | 19.03.2003 Original published format: US 390681 | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2319572 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2319572 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2319572 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/06, A61M16/08, A62B18/08 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
A61M16/0683 (EP,CN,US);
A61M16/06 (EP,CN,US);
A61M16/0057 (US);
A61M16/0066 (US);
A61M16/0605 (US);
A61M16/0616 (EP,CN,US);
A61M16/0622 (EP,CN,US);
A61M16/0666 (US);
A61M16/0816 (EP,CN,US);
A61M16/0825 (EP,US);
A61M16/0875 (US);
A61M16/22 (US);
A62B18/084 (EP,CN,US);
A61M16/0633 (EP,US);
A61M16/0694 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/19] | Title | German: | Ergonomische und anpassbare Atemmaskenanordnung mit Halterung | [2011/19] | English: | Ergonomic and adjustable respiratory mask assembly with headgear assembly | [2011/19] | French: | Ensemble masque respirateur ergonomique et réglable avec dispositif de rétention | [2011/19] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/35] | 09.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.12.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03252555.2 / EP1356842 | EP06018065.0 / EP1721630 | EP10153114.3 / EP2221081 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030252555) is 27.12.2005 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.04.2003 | AT | 02.07.2014 | BE | 02.07.2014 | CY | 02.07.2014 | CZ | 02.07.2014 | DK | 02.07.2014 | EE | 02.07.2014 | ES | 02.07.2014 | FI | 02.07.2014 | IT | 02.07.2014 | MC | 02.07.2014 | NL | 02.07.2014 | RO | 02.07.2014 | SI | 02.07.2014 | SK | 02.07.2014 | TR | 02.07.2014 | BG | 02.10.2014 | GR | 03.10.2014 | PT | 03.11.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/32] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
BE | 02.07.2014 | ||
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 02.07.2014 | |
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 02.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1706601 (BERNHARD DRAGER ALEXANDER, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE956195 (DRAEGERWERK AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB792377 (AIRMED LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB799225 (CHIRANA PRAHA) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]GB880942 (SIERRA ENG CO) [X] 1 * page 2, lines 43-130; figure 1 *; | [X]DE1708110 (MEDIZINTECHNIK LEIPZIG VEB) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9700092 (APOTHEUS LAB LTD [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9906116 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5937851 (SEROWSKI ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0078383 (RESMED LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1 * page 5, line 8 - page 7, line 27; figures 4-7B *; | [A]WO0078381 (RESMED LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19962515 (MAP GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 34; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US2001032648 (JESTRABEK-HART BERNADETTE [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0195965 (FISHER & PAYKEL [NZ], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [AP]US6374826 (GUNARATNAM MICHAEL K [AU], et al) [AP] 1 * the whole document *; | [AP]US2002096176 (GUNARATNAM MICHAEL K [AU], et al) [AP] 1 * the whole document *; | [E]WO03082406 (INVACARE CORP [US], et al) [E] 1* the whole document *; | [E]WO03090827 (RESMED LTD [AU], et al) [E] 1 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2004073778 (RESMED LTD [AU], et al) [E] 1 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2004073777 (RESMED LTD [AU], et al) [E] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US619693 | US3990727 | US4944310 | US5243971 | US5245995 | US5704345 | US5724965 | WO9812965 | WO9961088 | US6112746 | US6119694 | US6119693 | WO0069521 | WO0078384 | US6357441 | US6412487 | US19980021541 | US20000482718 | US20000502745 | US20000504220 | US20000504234 | US20000594775 | US20020402509 | WO2003AU00097 |