EP2269578 - Device for producing a microfoam for use in sclerotherapy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/01] | Generation of Therapeutic Microfoam | ||
[2013/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BTG International Limited 5 Fleet Place London EC4M 7RD / GB | [2011/23] |
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states BTG INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 5 Fleet Place London EC4M 7RD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Osman, Tariq c/o BTG International Limited IP Business Services 5 Fleet Place London EC4M7RD / GB | 02 /
Harman, Anthony c/o BTG International Limited IP Business Services 5 Fleet Place London EC4M7RD / GB | 03 /
Wright, David c/o BTG International Limited IP Business Services 5 Fleet Place London EC4M7RD / GB | 04 /
Shilton-Brown (née Flynn), Sheila c/o BTG International Limited IP Business Services 5 Fleet Place London EC4M7RD / GB | 05 /
Boorman, Timothy c/o BTG International Limited IP Business Services 5 Fleet Place London EC4M7RD / GB | [2015/05] |
Former [2011/01] | 01 /
Osman, Tariq c/o BTG International Limited IP Business Services 5 Fleet Place London EC4M7RD / GB | ||
02 /
Harman, Anthony c/o BTG International Limited IP Business Services 5 Fleet Place London EC4M7RD / GB | |||
03 /
Wright, David c/o BTG International Limited IP Business Services 5 Fleet Place London EC4M7RD / GB | |||
04 /
Shilton-Brown (née Flynn), Sheila c/o BTG International Limited IP Business Services 5 Fleet Place London EC4M7RD / GB | |||
05 /
Boorman, Timothy c/o BTG International Limited IP Business Services 5 Fleet Place London EC4M7RD / GB | Representative(s) | BTG plc Intellectual Property Group 5 Fleet Place London EC4M 7RD / GB | [2015/05] |
Former [2011/01] | Dolan, Anthony Patrick BTG International Limited 5 Fleet Place London EC4M 7RD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10184976.8 | 26.05.2000 | [2011/01] | Priority number, date | GB19990012356 | 26.05.1999 Original published format: GB 9912356 | [2011/01] | Previously filed application, date | EP20050023679 | 26.05.2000 | [2011/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2269578 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2269578 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2269578 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/12, A61M5/31, B05B11/02, A61P9/14 | [2013/28] | CPC: |
A61K9/122 (EP,US);
A61K9/12 (KR,NO);
A61K31/08 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61M5/31 (NO);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
B05B11/02 (EP,US);
B05B7/0037 (EP,US);
B05B7/0483 (EP);
B65D83/14 (EP,NO,US);
B65D83/16 (NO);
B65D83/20 (EP,US);
B65D83/48 (EP,US);
B65D83/60 (EP,US);
B65D83/62 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/20] | A61K9/12, B65D83/48, A61M5/31, B65D83/62, B65D83/20 | ||
Former IPC [2011/01] | A61K9/12, B65D83/16, A61M5/31, B65D83/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2011/01] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines Mikroschaums zur Nutzung in Sklerotherapie | [2013/28] | English: | Device for producing a microfoam for use in sclerotherapy | [2013/28] | French: | Dispositif de production de micromousse pour traitement sclerosant | [2013/28] |
Former [2011/01] | Herstellung von therapeutischem Mikroschaum | ||
Former [2011/01] | Generation of Therapeutic Microfoam | ||
Former [2011/01] | Production de micromousse thérapeutique | Examination procedure | 29.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 07.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00931445.1 / EP1180015 | EP05023679.3 / EP1637127 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000931445) is 14.08.2003 | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/01] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 11.03.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 11.03.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.04.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 11.03.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 11.03.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.04.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.01.2015 | BE | 28.01.2015 | CY | 28.01.2015 | DK | 28.01.2015 | ES | 28.01.2015 | FI | 28.01.2015 | IT | 28.01.2015 | MC | 28.01.2015 | PT | 28.01.2015 | SE | 28.01.2015 | GR | 29.04.2015 | IE | 26.05.2015 | LU | 26.05.2015 | CH | 31.05.2015 | LI | 31.05.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2017/40] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CY | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IE | 26.05.2015 | ||
LU | 26.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IE | 26.05.2015 | ||
LU | 26.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IE | 26.05.2015 | ||
LU | 26.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LU | 26.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 28.01.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US3970219 (SPITZER JOSEPH GEORGE, et al); | [YP]WO9943371 (MONFREUX ALAIN [FR]) | by applicant | EP0656203 | US5676962 | WO9943371 |