EP2436709 - Non-etherified reaction product of a cyclic urea and a multifunctional aldehyde [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CYTEC TECHNOLOGY CORP. 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | [2012/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gupta, Ram B. / 511 West Main Street Stamford, CT 06904 / US | 02 /
Flood, Lawrence A. / 151 West Rocks Road Norwalk, CT 06851 / US | 03 /
Treasurer, Urvee Y. / 245 Sycamore Terrace Stamford, CT 06904 / US | 04 /
Lawless, Barry A. / 41 Pauline Street Milford, CT 06460 / US | 05 /
Brogan, Colin c/o CYTEC Industries, Inc. 1937 West Main Street Stamford, CT 06904 / US | [2012/14] | Representative(s) | Deckers, Hellmuth Alexander, et al European Patent Attorney Breitbachstrasse 15 55218 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2012/14] | Application number, filing date | 10185095.6 | 30.09.2010 | [2012/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2436709 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08G12/36, C08G12/42, C08L61/26, C09D161/26, B32B21/02, C08K3/00 | [2012/14] | CPC: |
C08G12/12 (EP,US);
C08G12/36 (EP,KR,US);
C09D133/02 (US);
C08G12/42 (KR);
C08L61/26 (KR);
C09D161/24 (EP,US);
C09D161/26 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Unveräthertes Reaktionsprodukt aus einem cyclischen Harnstoff und einem mehrfunktionellen Aldehyd | [2012/14] | English: | Non-etherified reaction product of a cyclic urea and a multifunctional aldehyde | [2012/14] | French: | Produit de réaction non éthérifiés d'une urée cyclique et aldéhyde multifonctions | [2012/14] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/15] | 20.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4284758 (NORTH BERNARD F) [X] 1-22 * column 1, line 7 - column 8, line 18; example -; claims 1-5 *; | [X]US4345063 (NORTH BERNARD F) [X] 1-22 * column 1, line 10 - column 8, line 27; example -; claims 1-22 *; | [A]US4395504 (SULZBERG THEODORE, et al) [A] 1-22* column 1, line 5 - column 4, line 48; example -; claims 1-5 *; | [X]WO2009073836 (CYTEC TECH CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * page 1, line 5 - page 8, line 30; example -; claims 1-13 * | by applicant | JPS5344567 | WO2009073836 | - S. MAHAJANI; M. M. SHARMA, ORGANIC PROCESS RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, (1997), pages 97 - 105 | - J. M. KLIEGMAN; R. K. BARNES, J. ORG. CHEM., (1973), vol. 38, no. 3, page 556 |