EP2302458 - Lithography system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAPPER LITHOGRAPHY IP B.V. Computerlaan 15 2628 XK Delft / NL | [2011/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van 't Spijker, Johannes Christiaan c/o Computerlaan 15 2628 XK, Delft / NL | 02 /
Jager, Remco c/o Computerlaan 15 2628 XK Delft / NL | 03 /
Wieland, Marco Jan-Jaco c/o Computerlaan 15 2628 XK, Delft / NL | 04 /
Kruit, Pieter Koornmarkt 49 2611 EB, Delft / NL | [2016/25] |
Former [2011/13] | 01 /
Van 't Spijker, Johannes Christiaan c/o Computerlaan 15 2628 XK, Delft / NL | ||
02 /
Jager, Remco Wijnbrugstraat 239 3011 XW Rotterdam / NL | |||
03 /
Wieland, Marco Jan-Jaco c/o Computerlaan 15 2628 XK, Delft / NL | |||
04 /
Kruit, Pieter Koornmarkt 49 2611 EB, Delft / NL | Representative(s) | Peters, Sebastian Martinus Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. Koninginnegracht 19 2514 AB Den Haag / NL | [2016/37] |
Former [2011/13] | Peters, Sebastian Martinus Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. Dr. Kuyperstraat 6 2514 BB Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 10185251.5 | 24.10.2003 | [2011/13] | Priority number, date | US20020421464P | 25.10.2002 Original published format: US 421464 P | [2011/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2302458 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2302458 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | [2011/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2302458 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20, H01J37/317 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/2006 (KR);
G03F7/70383 (KR,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,KR,US);
G03B27/52 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70291 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70508 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70825 (KR,US);
G03F7/70991 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/045 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/3174 (EP,US);
H01J37/3177 (EP,US);
H01L21/0274 (KR);
H01L21/0275 (KR);
H01J2237/0432 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/37] |
Former [2011/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lithographisches System | [2011/13] | English: | Lithography system | [2011/13] | French: | Système de lithographie | [2011/13] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/46] | 14.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03759083.3 / EP1554634 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030759083) is 11.01.2008 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 04.02.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 04.02.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.02.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.10.2003 | BE | 14.09.2016 | CY | 14.09.2016 | CZ | 14.09.2016 | DK | 14.09.2016 | EE | 14.09.2016 | ES | 14.09.2016 | FI | 14.09.2016 | IT | 14.09.2016 | MC | 14.09.2016 | RO | 14.09.2016 | SE | 14.09.2016 | SI | 14.09.2016 | SK | 14.09.2016 | TR | 14.09.2016 | LU | 24.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | BG | 14.12.2016 | GR | 15.12.2016 | PT | 16.01.2017 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 24.10.2003 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
LU | 24.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | BE | 14.09.2016 | |
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
LU | 24.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | BE | 14.09.2016 | |
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
LU | 24.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | BE | 14.09.2016 | |
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | BE | 14.09.2016 | |
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | BE | 14.09.2016 | |
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | BE | 14.09.2016 | |
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | ES | 14.09.2016 | |
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9110170 (MANUFACTURING SCIENCES INC [US]) [A] 1,16 * page 11, line 19 - line 33 * * page 21, line 15 - page 24, line 19 * * page 31, line 3 - page 32, line 1 * * figures 1,2,14-16,18 *; | [X]US6014200 (SOGARD MICHAEL R [US], et al) [X] 1-8,14-16 * column 3, line 54 - line 67 * * column 6, line 9 - column 8, line 18 * * column 14, line 61 - column 15, line 62 * * figures 1, 2, 11A *; | [A]WO0060632 (UT BATTELLE LLC [US], et al) [A] 1,16 * page 8, line 17 - page 12, line 20 * * page 13, line 18 - page 14, line 20 * * page 15, line 13 - page 16, line 19 * * page 18, line 3 - page 19, line 8 * * figures 4-6,8 *; | [A]WO0135165 (ION DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [A] 1,16* page 28, line 4 - page 35, line 5 * | Examination | US2002145113 | by applicant | US5834783 | US5905267 | US5981954 | WO0118606 | US6285488 | US2001028042 | US2001028043 | US2001028044 | WO02054465 | WO02058118 | WO02058119 |