EP2266595 - Treatment of infections and other disorders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Regenerx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc. 3 Bethesda Metro Center, Suite 700 Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | [2010/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goldstein, Allan L. 800 25th Street N.W. Apt. 1005 Washington, DC 20037 / US | 02 /
Finkelstein, Jack JR. 3910 East-West Highway Chevy Chase, MD 20815 / US | [2011/26] |
Former [2010/52] | 01 /
Goldstein, Allan L. 800 25th Street N.W. Apt. 1005 Washington, DC 20037 / US | ||
02 /
Finkelstein, Jack JR. 3703 Taylor Street Chevy Chase, MD 20815 / US | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10185311.7 | 06.02.2003 | [2010/52] | Priority number, date | US20020354250P | 06.02.2002 Original published format: US 354250 P | US20020421038P | 25.10.2002 Original published format: US 421038 P | [2010/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2266595 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2266595 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/00, A61P31/04, A61P1/00 | [2011/27] | CPC: |
A61K38/08 (EP,US);
A61K38/2292 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2010/52] | A61K38/22, A61P1/00, A61P31/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/52] | Title | German: | Behandlung von Infektionen und anderen Erkrankungen | [2010/52] | English: | Treatment of infections and other disorders | [2010/52] | French: | Traitement d'infections et d'autres troubles | [2010/52] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 01.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/09] | 10.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/09] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03808930.6 / EP1497322 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030808930) is 24.01.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9418988 (VON ARNIM ULRICH CHRISTOPH [DE]) [X] 1-20 * whole document esp. pages 1,27 and claims 2,6,7 *; | [X]WO9949883 (UNIV GLASGOW [GB], et al) [X] 1-20 * whole document esp. page 6 and claim 12 *; | [A] - YAMAMOTO T ET AL, "Thymosin beta-4 Expression Is Correlated with Metastatic Capacity of Colorectal Carcinomas", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, vol. 193, no. 2, doi:10.1006/BBRC.1993.1682, ISSN 0006-291X, (19930615), pages 706 - 710, (19930615), XP024767553 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1993.1682 | by applicant | WO9949883 | WO1999GB00833 | WO1999US17282 |