EP2305655 - Amino-1,3,5-triazines N-substituted with chiral bicyclic radicals, process for their preparation, compositions thereof, and their use as herbicides and plant growth regulators. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/14] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahrens, Hartmut Auf der Höhe 14 63329, Egelsbach / DE | 02 /
Dietrich, Hansjörg Bonifatiusstraße 1b 65835, Liederbach / DE | 03 /
Minn, Klemens Rossertstr. 61 65795, Hattersheim / DE | 04 /
Auler, Thomas Claasholz 24 42799, Leichlingen / DE | 05 /
Bieringer, Hermann Eichenweg 26 65817, Eppstein / DE | 06 /
Hills, Martin Am Iztelgrund 5b 65510, Idstein / DE | 07 /
Kehne, Heinz Iltisweg 7a 65719, Hofheim / DE | 08 /
Menne, Hubert Biebricher Str. 7i 55252, Mainz Kastel / DE | [2011/14] | Application number, filing date | 10185534.4 | 23.01.2004 | [2011/14] | Priority number, date | EP20030002438 | 05.02.2003 Original published format: EP 03002438 | EP20030016680 | 01.08.2003 Original published format: EP 03016680 | WO2004EP00538 | 23.01.2004 Original published format: PCT/EP2004/000538 | [2011/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2305655 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2305655 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D251/18, C07D401/12, C07D311/68, C07C13/465, C07C13/48, A01N43/68 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D251/18 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/68 (EP,US);
C07D311/68 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/14] | Extension states | AL | 29.12.2011 | LT | 29.12.2011 | LV | 29.12.2011 | MK | 29.12.2011 | Title | German: | Amino-1,3,5-Triazine n-Substituierte mit chiralen Substituenten, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung, sie enthaltende Zusammensetzungen und deren Verwendung als Herbiziden und Pflanzenwachstumsregulatoren | [2011/14] | English: | Amino-1,3,5-triazines N-substituted with chiral bicyclic radicals, process for their preparation, compositions thereof, and their use as herbicides and plant growth regulators. | [2011/14] | French: | Amino-1,3,5-triazines n-substituées par des groupements bicycliques chiraux, procédé pour leur obtention, compositions les contenant et leur utilisation en tant qu' herbicides et régulateurs de croissance végétale | [2011/14] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 05.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/14] | 22.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/14] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04704591.9 / EP1592674 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040704591) is 23.05.2007 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 05.04.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 05.04.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.04.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4948395 (ARMSTRONG DANIEL W [US]) [A] 12 * example 2; tables IA,,IB *; | [X]WO9621640 (TEVA PHARMA [IL], et al) [X] 12 * example 21 *; | [X]WO9731904 (HOECHST SCHERING AGREVO GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-19 * page 2, line 1 - page 4, line 7; claim 1 * * page 8, paragraph 2 *; | [X]EP0864567 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [X] 1-19 * page 2, line 31 - page 4, line 31; claim 1 *; | [X]WO9847877 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 8 * see intermediates 1,2,22,23 *; | [IP]WO03070710 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE GMBH [DE], et al) [IP] 11* example 1a *; | [XP]WO03099266 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [XP] 12 * example 169A *; | [X] - ZHANG, Z,; ET AL, "Highly Enantioselective Hydrogenation of Cyclic Enamides Catalyzed by a Rh-PennPhos Catalyst", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 64, no. 6, pages 1774 - 1775, XP002262748 [X] 12 * tables 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo9824605 | by applicant | EP0086750 | EP0094349 | EP0131624 | JPS6087254 | EP0142924 | EP0174562 | EP0191736 | EP0193259 | US4631211 | EP0221044 | EP0242236 | EP0242246 | EP0257993 | EP0346620 | US4948395 | US5013659 | WO9107874 | WO9108202 | WO9113972 | WO9119806 | WO9200377 | EP0492366 | WO9211376 | WO9214827 | EP0582198 | WO9507897 | WO9729095 | WO9731904 | WO9745016 | WO9813361 | EP0864567 | WO9847877 | - A.R. KATRITZKY; C.W. REES, Comprehensive Heterocyclic Chemistry, PERGAMON PRESS, (1984), vol. 3, page 482 | - TETRAHEDRON ASYMMETRY, (1994), vol. 5, page 981 | - J. CHEM. SOC. PERKIN TRANS, (1979), page 2248 | - J. PRAKT. CHEM., (1997), vol. 339, pages 381 - 384 | - ORG. LETT., vol. 3, no. 25, page 4101 | - ARCH. PHARM., (1998), vol. 331, pages 59 - 71 | - J. OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, (2002), vol. 959, pages 75 - 83 | - JOURNAL OF MED. CHEM., (1999), vol. 42, pages 490 - 496 | - JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, (2002), vol. 959, pages 75 - 83 | - CHEM. EUROPE, (2000), vol. 6, pages 1840 - 1846 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1966), vol. 88, pages 2233 - 2240 | - J. MED. CHEM., (2002), vol. 45, pages 5260 - 5279 | - BIOCHEMISTRY, (1980), pages 2140 - 2144 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (1999), pages 1774 - 1775 | - TETRAHEDRON LETT., (2002), vol. 43, page 5260 | - FARMACO. ED. SCI., (1971), vol. 26, pages 474 - 486 | - J. AM. SOC., (1989), vol. 111, pages 3094 - 3095 | - ORG. LETT., (2002), vol. 4, pages 1695 - 1668 | - "Annual Reports in Combinatorial Chemistry and Molecular Diversity", S. H. DEWITT, Automated Synthesis, ESCOM, (1997), vol. 1, pages 69 - 77 | - HOUGHTEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1985), vol. 82, pages 5131 - 5135 | - CHRISTOU, TRENDS IN PLANT SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 1, pages 423 - 431 | - BRAUN ET AL., EMBO J., (1992), vol. 11, pages 3219 - 3227 | - WOLTER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 846 - 850 | - SONNEWALD ET AL., PLANT J., (1991), vol. 1, pages 95 - 106 | - WINNACKER-KUCHIER, Chemische Technologie, 4th Edition, C. HAUSER VERLAG, (1986), vol. 7 | - WATKINS, Handbook of Insecticide Dust Diluents and Carriers,2nd Ed.,, DARLAND BOOKS | - H.V. OLPHEN, Introduction to Clay Colloid Chemistry, 2nd Ed., J. WILEY & SONS | - MCCUTCHEON'S, Detergents and Emulsifiers Annual, MC PUBL. CORP. | - "Agglomeration", J.E. BROWNING, Chemical and Engineering, (1967), page 147 | - Perry's Chemical Engineer's Handbook, 5th Ed.,, MCGRAW-HILL, (1973), pages 8 - 57 | - G.C. KLINGMAN, Weed Control as a Science, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, IN, (1961), pages 81 - 96 | - J.D. FREYER; S.A. EVANS, Weed Control Handbook, 5th Ed.,, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, (1968), pages 101 - 103 | - WEED RESEARCH, (1986), vol. 26, pages 441 - 445 | WO1998EP06097 |