EP2361920 - Preparation and use of carbohydrate-based ring structures with antimicrobial and cytostatic activity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kemin Pharma Europe 2100 Maury Street Des Moines, IA 50301 / US | [2011/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sas, Benedikt Kwakkelstraat 71 Stekene 9190 / BE | 02 /
Van der Eycken, Johan Denterhoutemlaan 261 Ninove 9400 / BE | 03 /
Van Hemel, Johan Frits Van den Berghelaan 74 Aartselaar B2630 / BE | 04 /
Blom, Petra Bouwmeestersstraat 92 Sint-Amandsberg B9040 / BE | 05 /
Vandenkerckhove, Jan Mosvenne 14A Testelt B3272 / BE | 06 /
Ruttens, Bart Serskampsteenweg 137 Wetteren 9230 / BE | [2011/35] | Representative(s) | Evans, Jacqueline Gail Victoria Marches Intellectual Property Limited Wyastone Business Park Wyastone Leys Ganarew Monmouth NP25 3SR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | Evans, Jacqueline Gail Victoria Marches Intellectual Property Ltd Solutions House, Old Monmouth Road Whitchurch Ross-on-Wye, Herefordshire HR9 6DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10185546.8 | 15.10.2002 | [2011/35] | Priority number, date | US20010977478 | 15.10.2001 Original published format: US 977478 | [2011/35] | Previously filed application, date | WO2002US32817 | 15.10.2002 | [2011/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2361920 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2361920 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07H9/02, C07H9/06, A61K31/7052, A61K31/7048, A61P31/04, A61P31/12, A61P35/00, C07H15/207, C07H5/10, C07H7/02, C07H7/04, C07H9/04, C07H15/203, A61K31/351, A61K31/357, C07D309/16, C07D319/08, C07H15/10, C07D309/10, C07D493/04 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
C07H15/10 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D309/10 (EP,US);
C07D493/04 (EP,US);
C07H15/203 (EP,US);
C07H7/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/35] | C07H9/02, C07H9/06, A61K31/7052, A61K31/7048, A61P31/04, A61P31/12, A61P35/00, C07H15/207, C07H5/10, C07H7/02, C07H7/04, C07H9/04, C07H15/203, A61K31/351, A61K31/357, C07D309/16, C07D319/08, C07H15/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2011/35] | Title | German: | Herstellung und Verwendung von kohlenhydratbasierten Ringstrukturen mit antimikrobieller und zytostatischer Aktivität | [2011/35] | English: | Preparation and use of carbohydrate-based ring structures with antimicrobial and cytostatic activity | [2011/35] | French: | Préparation et utilisation de structures cycliques à base d'hydrocarbures dotées d'une activité antimicrobienne et cytostatique | [2011/35] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/21] | 04.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/34] | 25.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/34] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02770578.9 / EP1446391 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020770578) is 12.06.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5607922 (DE CLERCQ ERIK D A [BE], et al) [X] 1 * column 8; compound 3 *; | [X]EP0524439 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [X] 1 * page 24; compound (g) *; | [X]US5627194 (RAKHIT SUMANAS [CA], et al) [X] 1 * column 15 - column 16; example 9; compounds B, C *; | [X] - L SUN, "Stabilization of glycosyl sulfonium ions for stereoselective O-glycosylation", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (19940926), vol. 35, no. 39, doi:10.1016/0040-4039(94)85346-0, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 7147 - 7150, XP055005848 [X] 1 * page 7149; compound 16 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4039(94)85346-0 | [X] - BOUSQUET E ET AL, "Capsular polysaccharide of Streptococcus pneumoniae type 19F: synthesis of the repeating unit", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, PERGAMON, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0008-6215(98)00218-3, (19981001), vol. 311, no. 4, ISSN 0008-6215, pages 171 - 181, XP004141929 [X] 1 * page 173; figure 2; compounds 2-3 * * page 174; compounds 2,8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0008-6215(98)00218-3 | [X] - BIAO Y ET AL, "A Novel Cleavage of Allyl Protection", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0040-4039(98)00906-X, (19980702), vol. 39, no. 27, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 4871 - 4874, XP004120781 [X] 1 * page 4872; compound 6a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(98)00906-X | [X] - WANJUN ZHENG ET AL., "Complete Relative Stereochemistry of Maitotoxin", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (19960828), vol. 118, no. 34, doi:10.1021/ja961230+, pages 7946 - 7968, XP002578909 [X] 1 * page 7958; scheme 18; reaction (a)(1) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JA961230 | [A] - WONDRACK L ET AL, "CLINICAL STRAIN OF STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS INACTIVATES AND CAUSES EFFLUX OF MACROLIDES", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19960101), vol. 40, no. 4, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 992 - 998, XP009083016 [A] 1 * page 994; figure 1; compound 1 * |