EP2359689 - Microfluidic device for cell separation and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The General Hospital Corporation 55 Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | [2011/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toner, Mehmet 100 Pilgrim Road Wellesley, MA 02481 / US | 02 /
Truskey, George 921 Monmouth Avenue Durham, NC 27701 / US | 03 /
Kapur, Ravi 292 Morton Street Stoughton, MA 02072 / US | [2015/35] |
Former [2011/34] | 01 /
Toner, Mehmet 100 Pilgrim Road Wellesley, MA 02481 / US | ||
02 /
Truskey, George 921 Monmouth Avenue Durham, NC 27701 / US | |||
03 /
Kapur, Ravi 292 Morton Street Stoughton, MA 02072 / US | Representative(s) | Conroy, John, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2015/35] |
Former [2011/34] | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. HighLight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10185652.4 | 29.09.2003 | [2011/34] | Priority number, date | US20020414065P | 27.09.2002 Original published format: US 414065 P | US20020414258P | 27.09.2002 Original published format: US 414258 P | US20020414102P | 27.09.2002 Original published format: US 414102 P | [2011/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2359689 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2359689 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, B01L9/00, G01N33/50, G01N33/543, G01N33/569, C12N5/02, C12N5/10, C12M3/00, B82Y30/00, C12N5/00, G01N33/574, G01N1/40 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
B01L3/502753 (EP,US);
B01L1/52 (EP,US);
B01L3/502746 (EP,US);
B01L3/502761 (US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C12N5/0087 (EP,US);
G01N1/405 (US);
G01N33/5091 (EP,US);
G01N33/54366 (US);
G01N33/54386 (EP,US);
G01N33/56966 (EP,US);
G01N33/574 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0647 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0652 (US);
B01L2200/0668 (EP,US);
B01L2200/12 (US);
B01L2300/0681 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0864 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0867 (US);
B01L2300/0877 (US);
B01L2300/0883 (US);
B01L2300/12 (US);
B01L2400/0487 (EP,US);
B01L2400/086 (EP,US);
B01L9/54 (US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US);
G01N1/40 (EP,US);
G01N2015/1006 (EP,US);
G01N2015/1028 (EP,US);
G01N2333/70582 (EP,US);
G01N2333/70589 (EP,US);
G01N2333/70596 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/34] | A01N1/02, C12M1/00, C12M1/34, C12M3/00, C12N5/00, C12N5/02, C12N5/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/35] |
Former [2011/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mikrofluid-Vorrichtung zur Zelltrennung, sowie Verwendung derselben | [2015/15] | English: | Microfluidic device for cell separation and use thereof | [2011/34] | French: | Dispositif microfluidique pour la séparation de cellules et usage du dispositif | [2011/34] |
Former [2011/34] | Mikrofluid-Vorrichtung zur Zelltrennung sowie Verwendungen derselben | Examination procedure | 01.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 24.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03798803.7 / EP1569510 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030798803) is 25.10.2006 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2003 | AT | 26.08.2015 | BE | 26.08.2015 | BG | 26.08.2015 | CY | 26.08.2015 | CZ | 26.08.2015 | DK | 26.08.2015 | EE | 26.08.2015 | ES | 26.08.2015 | FI | 26.08.2015 | IT | 26.08.2015 | MC | 26.08.2015 | NL | 26.08.2015 | RO | 26.08.2015 | SE | 26.08.2015 | SI | 26.08.2015 | SK | 26.08.2015 | TR | 26.08.2015 | IE | 29.09.2015 | LU | 29.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | GR | 27.11.2015 | PT | 28.12.2015 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 29.09.2003 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
BG | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
TR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IE | 29.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
IE | 29.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
IE | 29.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
IE | 29.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 26.08.2015 | |
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 26.08.2015 | |
GR | 27.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5770029 (NELSON ROBERT J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * column 3, line 32 - column 5, line 54; claims 1-14 * [I] 3-6; | [XI]US5866345 (WILDING PETER [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * column 2, line 46 - column 5, line 6; claims 1-18 * [I] 3-6; | [XI]WO0062931 (CLINICAL MICRO SENSORS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * page 10, line 33 - page 13, line 35; claims 1-35 * [I] 3-6; | [XI]WO0212896 (AVIVA BIOSCIENCES CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,7 * figures 1-14; claims 1-69 *[I] 3-6 | by applicant | US5837115 | WO0135071 | - T. MAREN, MOL. PHARMACOL., (1970), vol. 6, page 430 | - PAWLIK ET AL., CANCER, (2002), vol. 95, pages 1171 - 81 | - BOYER ET AL., BLOOD, (1976), vol. 47, pages 883 - 897 |