EP2436389 - Milk-based protein hydrolysates and infant formulae and nutritional compositions made thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nestec S.A. IP Department Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | For all designated states Nestec S.A. IP Department Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Affolter, Michael 8, ch. de la Séchaude 1073 Savigny / CH | 02 /
Bureau-Franz, Isabelle 29, chemin des Clairières 1066 Epalinges / CH | 03 /
Maynard, Françoise Balsigerrain 28 3095 Speigel bei Bern / CH | 04 /
Mercenier, Annick Ch. de Rente 10 1030 Bussigny / CH | 05 /
Panchaud, Alexandre Ch. de la Planche-aux-Oies 1000 Lausanne 26 / CH | [2012/14] | Representative(s) | Corticchiato, Olivier Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | Corticchiato, Olivier Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 10186222.5 | 01.10.2010 | [2012/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2436389 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/01, A23J3/34, A23L1/305, A61P37/08 | [2012/14] | CPC: |
A23C9/1526 (EP,US);
A61K39/35 (US);
A23J3/343 (US);
A23J3/344 (US);
A23L33/18 (EP,US);
A23L33/19 (EP,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,US);
A61K38/018 (EP,RU,US);
A61P37/08 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/304, A23V2250/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Proteinhydrolysate auf Milchbasis und Babynahrungsformeln und Nährstoffzusammensetzungen daraus | [2012/14] | English: | Milk-based protein hydrolysates and infant formulae and nutritional compositions made thereof | [2012/14] | French: | Hydrolysats de protéine à base de lait et formulations pour nourrissons et compositions nutritionnelles fabriquées à partir de ceux-ci | [2012/14] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH06343422 ; | [XI]JP2000063284 ; | [XI]US2002037357 (FRITSCHE RODOLPHE [CH], et al) [X] 1-10,12-15,17-22 * paragraphs [0002] , [0045]; examples 2,6 * [I] 11,16; | [XI]WO2010079039 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [X] 1-10,12-15,17-22 * page 15, line 12 - line 16; examples 1-6 * [I] 11,16; | [E]WO2010112546 (NOVOZYMES AS [DK]) [E] 1-22* page 17, line 3 - line 25; claims 1,2,15 *; | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 10, Database accession no. 1995-069270, XP002627250 & JPH06343422 A 19941220 (MEIJI MILK PROD CO LTD) [X] 1-10,12-15,17-22 * abstract * [I] 11,16 | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 22, Database accession no. 2000-251451, XP002627251 & JP2000063284 A 20000229 (MORINAGA MILK IND CO LTD) [X] 1-10,12-15,17-22 * abstract * [I] 11,16 | by applicant | WO8803947 | EP0353122 | US5039532 | WO9304593 | US5288627 | EP0631731 | US5693520 | EP0827697 | EP0880902 | WO2004072279 | - VON BERG A; KOLETZKO S; GRUB A; FILIPIAK-PITTROFF B; WICHMANN HE; BAUER CP; REINHARDT D; BERDEL D, "German Infant Nutritional Intervention Study Group", J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL., (200303), vol. 111, pages 533 - 40 | - VON BERG A; KOLETZKO S; FILIPIAK-PITTROFF B; LAUBEREAU B; GRUB A; WICHMANN HE; BAUER CP; REINHARDT D; BERDEL D, "German Infant Nutritional Intervention Study Group", J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL., (200703), vol. 119, pages 718 - 25 | - VON BERG A; FILIPIAK-PITTROFF B; KRAMER U; LINK E; BOLLRATH C; BROCKOW , KOLETZKO S; GRUB A; HEINRICH J; WICHMANN HE; BAUER CP, "GINlplus study group", J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNODOL, (2008), vol. 121, pages 1442 - 7 | - ADLER-NISSEN J, J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (1979), vol. 27, no. 6, pages 1256 - 1262 |