EP2383650 - Methods for distributed program execution with file-type association in a client-server network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Citrix Systems, Inc. 851 W. Cypress Creek Road Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309 / US | [2011/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peart, Franklyn 3371 Overlook Road Davie, FL 33309 / US | 02 /
Richtberg, Michael 5461 NW 86 Terrace Coral Springs, FL 33067 / US | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/06] | Cooper, John, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2011/44] | Simons, Alison, et al Dummett Copp LLP 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB | Application number, filing date | 10186272.0 | 01.10.2002 | [2011/44] | Priority number, date | US20010970038 | 02.10.2001 Original published format: US 970038 | US20010970037 | 02.10.2001 Original published format: US 970037 | US20010970462 | 02.10.2001 Original published format: US 970462 | [2011/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2383650 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
G06F9/547 (EP);
G06F15/16 (KR);
G06F9/4843 (EP);
G06F9/505 (EP);
G06F9/5055 (EP);
G06F2209/509 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2011/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren für verteilte Programmausführung mit Dateiassoziation in einem Client-Server-Netzwerk | [2011/44] | English: | Methods for distributed program execution with file-type association in a client-server network | [2011/44] | French: | Procédés pour l'exécution de programmes distribués avec association de type fichier dans un réseau client-serveur | [2011/44] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 20.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/30] | 05.02.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.03.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/30] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02768936.3 / EP1470482 | EP06021940.9 / EP1755041 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.03.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 27.03.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.04.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5838906 (DOYLE MICHAEL D [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US6128642 (DORASWAMY NAGANAND [US], et al) [A] 4-7 * abstract * * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 45 *; | [I] - ANONYMOUS, "Tarantella Web-enabling Software, One World, One Network, One Answer, An SCO Technical White Paper", SANTA CRUZ OPERATION, INC., (19991231), pages 1 - 25, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/19990915181007/http://www.tarantella.sco.com/info/wps/wp1 .pdf, (20030818), XP002251538 [I] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Tarantella Administration Guide > Reference > Objects and attributes : Windows Application object", THE SANTA CRUZ OPERATION, INC., (1999), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://www.tarantella.com/knowhow/eii/help/html/en_US/ag_ref/windows_object.html, (20040419), XP002277254 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Tarantella Administration Guide > Reference > Load balancing with arrays : Multiple application servers", THE SANTA CRUZ OPERATION, INC., (1999), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.tarantella.com/knowhow/eii/help/html/en_US/ag_ref/load_hosts.html, (20040419), XP002277256 [A] 4-7 * the whole document * |