EP2312287 - Infra-red imager [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Semi-Conductor Devices - An Elbit Systems - Rafael Partnership P.O. Box 2250 31021 Haifa / IL | [2011/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oster, Dov 29 Galil St. 9770 Reut Modiin / IL | 02 /
Singer, Michael 94 Sneer St. 25147 Kfar Vradim / IL | 03 /
Koifman, Alina 37A Shivtey Israel St. 27223 Qiryat Bialik / IL | 04 /
Markovitz, Tuvy 4 Oren St. 2514 Kfar Vradim / IL | [2011/16] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10186403.1 | 04.10.2010 | [2011/16] | Priority number, date | US20090249320P | 07.10.2009 Original published format: US 249320 P | [2011/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2312287 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01J5/06, G01J5/08 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
G01J5/06 (EP,US);
G01J5/061 (EP,US);
G01J5/08 (EP,US);
G01J5/0806 (EP,US);
G01J2005/0077 (EP,US);
G01J2005/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Infrarotbildgeber | [2011/16] | English: | Infra-red imager | [2011/16] | French: | Imageur à infrarouges | [2011/16] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/18] | 28.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4507551 (HOWARD JAMES W [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9,11 * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 12; figure 1 *; | [XYI]US4827130 (RENO CHARLES W [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,11 * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 66; figures 1a,2a * [Y] 5,6,10[I] 10; | [XY]US5258618 (NOBLE MILTON L [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,9,11 * column 4, line 35 - line 46 * * column 5, line 23 - column 6, line 9; figure 2 * [Y] 5,6; | [XYI]US2009224156 (GIBBONS ROBERT C [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9,11 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1A,2A,3A * [Y] 5,6,10 [I] 4 | by applicant | US4820923 | US6969840 | US7180067 |