EP2438869 - Coupling element for an external fixator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stryker Trauma SA Bohnackerweg 1 2545 Selzach / CH | [2012/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Busch, Adam Speiserstrasse 12 4600 Olten / CH | 02 /
Dorawa, Klaus Gürweg 11 2553 Safnern / CH | 03 /
Gurevich, Vadim 25 Avenue at Port Imperial Apt. 820 West New York NJ 07093 / US | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | Frischknecht, Harry Ralph Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Frischknecht, Harry Ralph Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 10186847.9 | 07.10.2010 | [2012/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2438869 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2438869 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/64 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
A61B17/6466 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32163 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32893 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] |
Former [2012/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Kupplungselement für einen externen Fixierer | [2012/15] | English: | Coupling element for an external fixator | [2012/15] | French: | Élément de couplage pour fixateur externe | [2012/15] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/46] | 09.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.10.2010 | AL | 29.04.2015 | AT | 29.04.2015 | BE | 29.04.2015 | BG | 29.04.2015 | CY | 29.04.2015 | CZ | 29.04.2015 | DK | 29.04.2015 | EE | 29.04.2015 | FI | 29.04.2015 | HR | 29.04.2015 | LT | 29.04.2015 | LV | 29.04.2015 | MC | 29.04.2015 | MK | 29.04.2015 | MT | 29.04.2015 | NL | 29.04.2015 | PL | 29.04.2015 | RO | 29.04.2015 | RS | 29.04.2015 | SE | 29.04.2015 | SI | 29.04.2015 | SK | 29.04.2015 | SM | 29.04.2015 | TR | 29.04.2015 | NO | 29.07.2015 | GR | 30.07.2015 | IS | 29.08.2015 | PT | 31.08.2015 | IE | 07.10.2015 | LU | 07.10.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 07.10.2010 | |
AT | 29.04.2015 | ||
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
BG | 29.04.2015 | ||
CY | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
MK | 29.04.2015 | ||
MT | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SE | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
SM | 29.04.2015 | ||
TR | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
IE | 07.10.2015 | ||
LU | 07.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 07.10.2010 | |
AT | 29.04.2015 | ||
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
BG | 29.04.2015 | ||
CY | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
MT | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SE | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
SM | 29.04.2015 | ||
TR | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
IE | 07.10.2015 | ||
LU | 07.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
IE | 07.10.2015 | ||
LU | 07.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
LU | 07.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
LU | 07.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
LU | 07.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 29.04.2015 | |
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 29.04.2015 | |
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 29.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5304177 (PENNIG DIETMAR [DE]) [X] 13 * figures 1,2,4,5 * * column 3, lines 21-49 * [A] 6; | [XI]US5891144 (MATA JACQUES [CH], et al) [X] 1,3,4,11,13 * figures 2,3 * * column 2, lines 35-46,58-67 * [I] 2,5-10,12; | [XA]WO0247564 (SYNTHES USA [US], et al) [X] 13 * figures 2-4a,6 * * page 6, line 17 - line 25 *[A] 1; | [X]US2004059331 (MULLANEY MICHAEL W [US]) [X] 13 * figures 1,3,7 * * paragraphs [0068] - [0073] * | Examination | EP2294994 |