EP2333575 - Positioning for WLANs and other wireless networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive, R-132 D San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2011/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edge, Stephen W. 1109 Landavo Drive Escondido, CA 92027 / US | [2019/40] |
Former [2011/24] | 01 /
Edge, Stephen W. 1109 Landavo Drive Escondido, CA 92027 / US | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [2019/40] |
Former [2011/24] | Catesby, Olivia Joanne, et al Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 10187475.8 | 07.11.2006 | [2011/24] | Priority number, date | US20050734631P | 07.11.2005 Original published format: US 734631 P | US20050748225P | 06.12.2005 Original published format: US 748225 P | US20060856684P | 04.11.2006 Original published format: US 856684 P | [2011/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2333575 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2333575 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2333575 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/02, G01S5/14, H04L12/28, H04W64/00, // G01S19/14, G01S19/51 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
G01S5/0242 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G01S19/14 (KR);
G01S19/51 (KR);
G01S5/0236 (EP,CN,KR);
G01S5/0257 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G01S5/0278 (EP,CN,KR);
H04W4/02 (KR);
H04W64/00 (EP,CN,KR);
H04W84/12 (EP,CN,KR);
H04W88/08 (EP,CN,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/24] | G01S5/02, G01S5/14, H04L12/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/40] |
Former [2011/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Positionierung in WLAN- und anderen drahtlosen Netzwerken | [2011/24] | English: | Positioning for WLANs and other wireless networks | [2011/24] | French: | Localisation dans des réseaux locaux sans fil et dans d'autres reseaux sans fil | [2011/24] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 10.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 31.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06839755.3 / EP1960805 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060839755) is 14.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/37] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 06.08.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 06.08.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.08.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 06.08.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 06.08.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.08.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.11.2006 | AT | 02.10.2019 | CY | 02.10.2019 | CZ | 02.10.2019 | DK | 02.10.2019 | EE | 02.10.2019 | ES | 02.10.2019 | FI | 02.10.2019 | IT | 02.10.2019 | LT | 02.10.2019 | LV | 02.10.2019 | MC | 02.10.2019 | NL | 02.10.2019 | PL | 02.10.2019 | RO | 02.10.2019 | SE | 02.10.2019 | SI | 02.10.2019 | SK | 02.10.2019 | TR | 02.10.2019 | IE | 07.11.2019 | LU | 07.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | BG | 02.01.2020 | GR | 03.01.2020 | IS | 02.02.2020 | PT | 03.02.2020 | [2022/26] |
Former [2021/33] | HU | 07.11.2006 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CY | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
IE | 07.11.2019 | ||
LU | 07.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
CY | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
IE | 07.11.2019 | ||
LU | 07.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
IE | 07.11.2019 | ||
LU | 07.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
IE | 07.11.2019 | ||
LU | 07.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
LU | 07.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
LU | 07.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
LU | 07.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
LU | 07.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 02.10.2019 | |
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 02.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6091362 (STILP LOUIS A [US], et al) [I] 16,17 * column 66, line 40 - column 68, line 24 *; | [A]WO03094564 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-18 * claim 2 *; | [A]US2003234741 (ROGERS CHRISTOPHER B [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004002346 (SANTHOFF JOHN [US]) [X] 18* paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0103] *; | [I]US2004203904 (GWON YOUNGJUNE LEE [US], et al) [I] 16,17 * claims 11, 25, 29, 30 * * paragraphs [0177] , [ 178] *; | [IA]WO2005004527 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [I] 1-3,8,9,11-15 * paragraphs [0041] , [0049] - [0073] * [A] 4-7,10,16-18; | [X]US2005064877 (GUM ARNOLD J [US], et al) [X] 16,17 * paragraph [0017]; claims 20, 21 *; | [A] - "IP-BASED LOCATION SERVICES", 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT 2 3GPP2, XX, XX, (20051001), no. V1.0, pages 1 - 6, XP002436221 [A] 18 * Section 4 * | by applicant | US20050734631 | US20050748225 |