EP2311353 - Machine for the production of mixed beverages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cafés Folliet 574 Rue de Chantabord 73000 Chambéry / FR | [2011/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Folliet, Bernard / 441 chemin du Calvaire 73000 Chambéry / FR | [2012/03] |
Former [2011/16] | 01 /
Folliet, Bernard 441 chemin du Calvaire 73000, CHAMBERY / FR | Representative(s) | Chevalier, Renaud Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | Chevalier, Renaud Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10187597.9 | 14.10.2010 | [2011/16] | Priority number, date | FR20090057234 | 15.10.2009 Original published format: FR 0957234 | [2011/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2311353 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2311353 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/40, A47J31/60 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
A47J31/401 (EP);
A47J31/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/16] | Extension states | BA | 06.09.2011 | ME | 06.09.2011 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Mischgetränken | [2011/16] | English: | Machine for the production of mixed beverages | [2011/16] | French: | Machine pour la confection de boissons mixées | [2011/16] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 30.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.10.2010 | AL | 13.06.2012 | AT | 13.06.2012 | CY | 13.06.2012 | CZ | 13.06.2012 | DK | 13.06.2012 | EE | 13.06.2012 | FI | 13.06.2012 | HR | 13.06.2012 | LT | 13.06.2012 | LV | 13.06.2012 | MK | 13.06.2012 | MT | 13.06.2012 | NL | 13.06.2012 | PL | 13.06.2012 | RO | 13.06.2012 | RS | 13.06.2012 | SE | 13.06.2012 | SI | 13.06.2012 | SK | 13.06.2012 | SM | 13.06.2012 | TR | 13.06.2012 | BG | 13.09.2012 | NO | 13.09.2012 | GR | 14.09.2012 | IS | 13.10.2012 | IE | 14.10.2012 | LU | 14.10.2012 | PT | 15.10.2012 | BE | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 14.10.2010 | |
AL | 13.06.2012 | ||
AT | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
RS | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
SM | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
IE | 14.10.2012 | ||
LU | 14.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AL | 13.06.2012 | |
AT | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
RS | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
SM | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
IE | 14.10.2012 | ||
LU | 14.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AL | 13.06.2012 | |
AT | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
RS | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
IE | 14.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AL | 13.06.2012 | |
AT | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
RS | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
IE | 14.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
RS | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
IE | 14.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
RS | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
IE | 14.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
RS | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
IE | 14.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
RS | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
RS | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
RS | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
RS | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
RS | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
RS | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
RS | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
RS | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
RS | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
RS | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
RS | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 13.06.2012 | |
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
RS | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 13.06.2012 | |
NO | 13.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4324494 (PRYOR HARRY H, et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,9 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 12 * * column 3, lines 41-55 * * column 4, lines 10-15, 20-35 * * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 32 * * column 5, lines 53-63 * * column 7, lines 22-39 * * figures 1, 2, 4 * [A] 4; | [A]EP2062513 (GRUPPO CIMBALI SPA [IT]) [A] 1,2,6,7* paragraphs [0022] - [0030] - [0 36] , [0 39] , [0 40]; figure 1 * |