EP2450067 - Medical device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MaRVis Medical GmbH Auf dem Rotental 47 50226 Frechen / DE | [2013/09] |
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states MaRVis Technologies GmbH Dennewartstrasse 25 52068 Aachen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Düring, Klaus / Auf dem Rotental 47 50226, Frechen / DE | 02 /
Pfeffer, Joachim Georg / Feldstr. 8 52070, Aachen / DE | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Schüssler, Andrea, et al Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Schüssler, Andrea, et al Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10187863.5 | 18.10.2010 | [2012/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2450067 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/50, A61L29/18, A61L31/18 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
A61L29/126 (EP,CN,US);
A61M25/09 (CN,US);
A61L31/128 (US);
A61B10/0233 (EP,US);
A61L29/02 (US);
A61L29/049 (US);
A61L29/14 (US);
A61L29/18 (EP,CN,US);
A61L31/022 (US);
A61L31/041 (US);
A61L31/125 (EP,CN,US);
A61L31/14 (US);
A61L31/18 (EP,CN,US);
A61M25/0045 (CN);
A61M5/32 (US);
A61M2025/09133 (CN);
A61M2025/09166 (US);
A61M2025/09191 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Medizinische Vorrichtung | [2012/19] | English: | Medical device | [2012/19] | French: | Dispositif médical | [2012/19] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2012 | Examination requested [2012/51] | 18.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/45] | 03.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2013 | 31.10.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6099485 (PATTERSON FRANK VAN [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 2, line 19 - line 37 ** column 6, line 20 - line 56 *; | [X]US6458088 (HURTAK WENZEL FRANZ [NL], et al) [X] 1-6,10,11 * column 2, line 18 - line 29 * * page 3, line 22 - line 49 * * page 4, line 8 - line 19 * * claims 1,2 *; | [X]WO2007000148 (PFEFFER JOACHIM-GEORG [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,11 * page 3, paragraphs 3,4 * * page 4, paragraph 1 - paragraph 5 * * page 5, paragraphs 1,2 * * page 6, paragraphs 1,2 *; | [X]WO2009141165 (MARVIS TECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,10,11 * page 4, line 21 - line 32 * * page 13, line 7 - line 12 * * claims 1,5 * | by applicant | WO8702893 | WO9717622 | EP0659056 | WO9960920 | WO0222186 | EP1206945 | DE10040381 | US6458088 | DE10107750 | WO2005120598 | WO2007000148 | EP1818054 | WO2009141165 |