EP2314142 - Volumetric metering system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/17] | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Snipes, Terry L 3799 1st Street East Moline, IL 61244 / US | [2014/39] |
Former [2011/17] | 01 /
Snipes, Terry L 3799 1st Street East Moline, IL 61244 / US | Representative(s) | Reichert, Christian John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Straße 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2014/39] |
Former [2011/17] | Reichert, Christian Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Straße 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 10187938.5 | 18.10.2010 | [2011/17] | Priority number, date | US20090604708 | 23.10.2009 Original published format: US 604708 | [2011/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2314142 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2314142 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01C7/12, A01C7/10 | [2011/17] | CPC: |
A01C7/088 (EP);
A01C7/102 (US);
A01C7/124 (EP);
A01C7/125 (US);
A01C7/127 (US);
A01C7/12 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/17] | Title | German: | Volumetrisches Messsystem | [2011/17] | English: | Volumetric metering system | [2011/17] | French: | Système de mesure volumétrique | [2011/17] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/49] | 03.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.10.2010 | AL | 24.09.2014 | AT | 24.09.2014 | BG | 24.09.2014 | CY | 24.09.2014 | CZ | 24.09.2014 | DK | 24.09.2014 | EE | 24.09.2014 | ES | 24.09.2014 | FI | 24.09.2014 | HR | 24.09.2014 | IT | 24.09.2014 | LT | 24.09.2014 | LV | 24.09.2014 | MC | 24.09.2014 | MK | 24.09.2014 | MT | 24.09.2014 | NL | 24.09.2014 | PL | 24.09.2014 | RO | 24.09.2014 | RS | 24.09.2014 | SE | 24.09.2014 | SI | 24.09.2014 | SK | 24.09.2014 | SM | 24.09.2014 | TR | 24.09.2014 | IE | 18.10.2014 | LU | 18.10.2014 | BE | 31.10.2014 | CH | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | FR | 24.11.2014 | GB | 24.12.2014 | NO | 24.12.2014 | GR | 25.12.2014 | IS | 24.01.2015 | PT | 26.01.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 18.10.2010 | |
AT | 24.09.2014 | ||
BG | 24.09.2014 | ||
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
MK | 24.09.2014 | ||
MT | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
SM | 24.09.2014 | ||
TR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IE | 18.10.2014 | ||
LU | 18.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 24.11.2014 | ||
GB | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 18.10.2010 | |
AT | 24.09.2014 | ||
BG | 24.09.2014 | ||
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
MT | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
SM | 24.09.2014 | ||
TR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IE | 18.10.2014 | ||
LU | 18.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 24.11.2014 | ||
GB | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 18.10.2010 | |
AT | 24.09.2014 | ||
BG | 24.09.2014 | ||
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
SM | 24.09.2014 | ||
TR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IE | 18.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 24.11.2014 | ||
GB | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
BG | 24.09.2014 | ||
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
SM | 24.09.2014 | ||
IE | 18.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 24.11.2014 | ||
GB | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
SM | 24.09.2014 | ||
IE | 18.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 24.11.2014 | ||
GB | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
IE | 18.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 24.11.2014 | ||
GB | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/48] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
IE | 18.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 24.11.2014 | ||
GB | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
IE | 18.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 24.11.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 24.11.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 24.09.2014 | |
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 24.09.2014 | |
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 24.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4023707 (JOHNSON LEROY E) [Y] 1-8 * column 2, line 30 - line 34; figure 4 *; | [A]GB2056237 (NORDSTEN AS P) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]AT383720B (GROEMER HUBERT [AT]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]DE4411000 (WEISTE & CO ACCORD LANDMASCH [DE]) [Y] 2 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5845818 (GREGOR DAVID WALTER [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [YD]US2009079624 (DEAN BRIAN F [CA], et al) [YD] 1-8 * paragraphs [0046] , [0047] , [0048]; figures 2,4,5 * | by applicant | US20090079624 |