EP2314538 - Device and method for loss-free filling of continuously mixed products in containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones AG Böhmerwaldstraße 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2011/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meinzinger, Rupert Sonnenweg 20 94356, Kirchroth / DE | [2013/29] |
Former [2011/17] | 01 /
Meinzinger, Rupert Sonnenweg 20 94356, Kirchroth / DE | Representative(s) | Bittner, Bernhard Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Prüfeninger Strasse 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Bittner, Bernhard Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ägidienplatz 7 93047 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2011/17] | Bittner, Bernhard Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ägidienplatz 7 93047 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10188157.1 | 20.10.2010 | [2011/17] | Priority number, date | DE20091050388 | 22.10.2009 Original published format: DE102009050388 | [2011/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2314538 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2314538 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B67C3/20, B67C3/04 | [2011/17] | CPC: |
B67C3/04 (EP,US);
B67C3/023 (EP,US);
B67C3/204 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/17] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum verlustfreien Abfüllen von kontinuierlich gemischten Medien in Behältnisse | [2011/17] | English: | Device and method for loss-free filling of continuously mixed products in containers | [2011/17] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de remplissage sans perte de produits mélangés en continu dans des récipients | [2011/17] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 12.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.10.2010 | AL | 17.07.2013 | BG | 17.07.2013 | CY | 17.07.2013 | CZ | 17.07.2013 | DK | 17.07.2013 | EE | 17.07.2013 | FI | 17.07.2013 | HR | 17.07.2013 | LT | 17.07.2013 | LV | 17.07.2013 | MC | 17.07.2013 | MK | 17.07.2013 | MT | 17.07.2013 | PL | 17.07.2013 | RO | 17.07.2013 | SE | 17.07.2013 | SI | 17.07.2013 | SK | 17.07.2013 | SM | 17.07.2013 | TR | 17.07.2013 | NO | 17.10.2013 | RS | 17.10.2013 | GR | 18.10.2013 | IE | 20.10.2013 | LU | 20.10.2013 | ES | 28.10.2013 | BE | 31.10.2013 | IS | 17.11.2013 | PT | 18.11.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 20.10.2010 | |
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
MK | 17.07.2013 | ||
MT | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
SM | 17.07.2013 | ||
TR | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
RS | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
IE | 20.10.2013 | ||
LU | 20.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 20.10.2010 | |
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
MK | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
SM | 17.07.2013 | ||
TR | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
RS | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
IE | 20.10.2013 | ||
LU | 20.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
MK | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
SM | 17.07.2013 | ||
TR | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
IE | 20.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
SM | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
IE | 20.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
IE | 20.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 17.07.2013 | |
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 17.07.2013 | |
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 17.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0046103 (STAGNI MILENA [IT]) [X] 1-3 * page 10, lines 6-19 * * page 16, line 4 - page 18, line 5 * * figures 1,7-11D * [I] 8,10,12; | [XI]US2168380 (WINTON LEWIS B) [X] 1-3,5 * page 1, column 1, line 1 - page 3, column 2, line 30 * * figures 1-7 * [I] 12; | [X]US3128915 (MATTER GUSTAVE O) [X] 1,3,12 * column 1, lines 47-58 * * column 2, lines 6-29 * * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 30 * * column 4, lines 33-44 * * figures I-V * | by applicant | WO9406303 | EP0615947 | DE29917605U |