EP2280276 - Method for rapid electrochemical analysis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/05] | Method and apparatus for rapid electrochemical analysis | ||
[2019/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LifeScan, Inc. 1000 Gibraltar Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2011/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guo, Sherry 2651 Mignon Drive San Jose, CA 95132 / US | 02 /
Hodges, Alastair 15 Jasmine Crt Blackburn South, VIC 3130 / AU | 03 /
Chatelier, Ron 13 Apple Grove Bayswater VIC, 3153 / AU | 04 /
Zhang, Bin 41945 Via San Gabriel Fremont, CA 94539 / US | [2020/21] |
Former [2011/16] | 01 /
Guo, Sherry 2651 Mignon Drive San Jose, CA 95132 / US | ||
02 /
Hodges, Alastair 15 Jasmine Crt Blackburn South, VIC 3130 / AU | |||
03 /
Chatelier, Ron 13 Apple Grove Bayswater VIC, 3153 / AU | |||
04 /
Zhang, Bin 41945 Via San Gabriel Fremont, CA 94539 / US | |||
Former [2011/05] | 01 /
Guo, Sherry 2651 Mignon Drive San Jose, CA 95132 / US | ||
02 /
Hodges, Alastair 15 Jasmine Crt Blackburn South, VIC 3130 / AU | |||
03 /
Chatelier, Ron 11816 Westview Parkway Apt. 174 San Diego, CA 92126 / US | |||
04 /
Zhang, Bin 41945 Via San Gabriel Fremont, CA 94539 / US | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2020/21] |
Former [2011/05] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10188262.9 | 29.09.2006 | [2011/05] | Priority number, date | US20050240797 | 30.09.2005 Original published format: US 240797 | [2011/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2280276 | Date: | 02.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2280276 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | [2011/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2280276 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/1486, A61B5/145, G01N27/327 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/1486 (EP,US);
G01N27/3273 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0295 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/05] | G01N33/487, C12Q1/00, A61B5/00, G01N27/49 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/21] |
Former [2011/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren für schnelle elektrochemische Analyse | [2019/09] | English: | Method for rapid electrochemical analysis | [2019/09] | French: | Procédé d'analyse électrochimique rapide | [2019/09] |
Former [2011/05] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für schnelle elektrochemische Analyse | ||
Former [2011/05] | Method and apparatus for rapid electrochemical analysis | ||
Former [2011/05] | Procédé et appareil d'analyse électrochimique rapide | Examination procedure | 06.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 28.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06255055.3 / EP1770396 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060255055) is 20.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2006 | AT | 20.05.2020 | CY | 20.05.2020 | CZ | 20.05.2020 | DK | 20.05.2020 | EE | 20.05.2020 | FI | 20.05.2020 | LT | 20.05.2020 | LV | 20.05.2020 | MC | 20.05.2020 | PL | 20.05.2020 | RO | 20.05.2020 | SE | 20.05.2020 | SI | 20.05.2020 | SK | 20.05.2020 | TR | 20.05.2020 | BG | 20.08.2020 | GR | 21.08.2020 | IS | 20.09.2020 | PT | 21.09.2020 | IE | 29.09.2020 | LU | 29.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 20.05.2020 | |
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
TR | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
IE | 29.09.2020 | ||
LU | 29.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 20.05.2020 | |
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
IE | 29.09.2020 | ||
LU | 29.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 20.05.2020 | |
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
LU | 29.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AT | 20.05.2020 | |
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
LU | 29.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 20.05.2020 | |
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 20.05.2020 | |
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 20.05.2020 | |
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 20.05.2020 | |
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 20.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0157510 (LIFESCAN INC [US]) [Y] 1-5 * page 4, line 13 - page 14, line 2 *; | [Y]US2002053523 (LIAMOS CHARLES T [US], et al) [Y] 1-5* paragraphs [0182] , [0197] , [0198] * | by applicant | US6193873 | US6284125 | US6379513 | US6413410 | US6612111 | US6676995 | US6689411 | US6749887 | US2004120848 | US6780645 | US6830934 | US20020242951 |