EP2316714 - Vehicle combination comprising a tractor, a trailer with a sliding drawbar and an axial guiding device having a retractable pivoting arm [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Développement 16 Résidence du Manoir 56150 Baud / FR | [2012/26] |
Former [2011/18] | For all designated states Le Goff, Jean Philippe 16 Résidence du Manoir 56150 Baud / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Le Goff, Jean-Philippe 16 Résidence du Manoir 56150 Baud / FR | [2012/34] |
Former [2011/18] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Hays, Bertrand Novagraaf Technologies 12 Place des Halles Saint Louis 56100 Lorient / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | Hays, Bertrand Novagraaf Technologies 12 Place des Halles Saint Louis 56100 Lorient / FR | ||
Former [2011/18] | Hays, Bertrand Novagraaf Technologies 12 Place des Halles Saint Louis 56100 Lorient / FR | Application number, filing date | 10188278.5 | 20.10.2010 | [2011/18] | Priority number, date | FR20090005056 | 21.10.2009 Original published format: FR 0905056 | [2011/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2316714 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2316714 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B62D53/04 | [2011/18] | CPC: |
B60D1/01 (EP);
B62D53/045 (EP);
B62D53/06 (EP);
B62D63/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/18] | Title | German: | Fahrzeugkombination mit einem Zugfahrzeug, einem Anhänger mit verschiebbarer Deichsel und einer einen Schwenkarm aufweisenden Axialführungseinrichtung | [2011/18] | English: | Vehicle combination comprising a tractor, a trailer with a sliding drawbar and an axial guiding device having a retractable pivoting arm | [2011/18] | French: | Ensemble routier comprenant un véhicule tracteur, une remorque à timon coulissant et un dispositif de guidage axial à bras pivotant escamotable | [2011/18] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 09.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 01/exclusive | For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | Licencee: | Maxicargo ZA de Kergilet 56500 Plumelin / FR | Date: | 15.06.2012 | [2012/30] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.10.2010 | AL | 29.08.2012 | AT | 29.08.2012 | CY | 29.08.2012 | CZ | 29.08.2012 | DK | 29.08.2012 | EE | 29.08.2012 | FI | 29.08.2012 | HR | 29.08.2012 | LT | 29.08.2012 | LV | 29.08.2012 | MK | 29.08.2012 | MT | 29.08.2012 | NL | 29.08.2012 | PL | 29.08.2012 | RO | 29.08.2012 | RS | 29.08.2012 | SE | 29.08.2012 | SI | 29.08.2012 | SK | 29.08.2012 | SM | 29.08.2012 | TR | 29.08.2012 | IE | 20.10.2012 | LU | 20.10.2012 | BE | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | BG | 29.11.2012 | NO | 29.11.2012 | GR | 30.11.2012 | ES | 10.12.2012 | IS | 29.12.2012 | PT | 31.12.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 20.10.2010 | |
AL | 29.08.2012 | ||
AT | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
MT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
RS | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
SM | 29.08.2012 | ||
TR | 29.08.2012 | ||
IE | 20.10.2012 | ||
LU | 20.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AL | 29.08.2012 | |
AT | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
MT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
RS | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
SM | 29.08.2012 | ||
TR | 29.08.2012 | ||
IE | 20.10.2012 | ||
LU | 20.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AL | 29.08.2012 | |
AT | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
MT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
RS | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
TR | 29.08.2012 | ||
IE | 20.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AL | 29.08.2012 | |
AT | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
MT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
RS | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
IE | 20.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AL | 29.08.2012 | |
AT | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
MT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
RS | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
IE | 20.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
RS | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
IE | 20.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
RS | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
IE | 20.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
RS | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
IE | 20.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/32] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
RS | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 29.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4049289 (DECKROW RODGER E) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP1598262 (KERKLINGH HERMAN KAREL [NL], et al) [AD] 1 * column 5, paragraph [0015]; figures 2A-2C *; | [AP]EP2151373 (MAXICARGO [FR]) [AP] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1598262 |