EP2444923 - Mobile device and method for creating data records in the data-store of a calendar application based on the analysis of wirelessly transmitted messages containing information about the location, the time, the attendees and the confirmation of a meeting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2013/48] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2012/17] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scott, Sherryl Lee Lorraine 305 Phillip Street Extension: 79320 Waterloo Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | 02 /
Thompson, Julia Murdock 305 Phillip Street Waterloo Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 10188292.6 | 20.10.2010 | [2012/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2444923 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2444923 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00, H04L29/08, H04W4/02, G06F17/27 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
G06Q10/109 (EP,US);
H04L67/52 (EP,US);
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W4/023 (EP,US);
H04W4/027 (EP,US);
H04W4/029 (US);
H04W4/18 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/17] | Title | German: | Mobile Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Erstellung von Datensätzen in dem Datenspeicher einer Terminkalenderapplikation basierend auf der Analyse von drahtlosen Nachrichten, die Auskunft über Ort, Zeit, Teilnehmer und Bestätigung eines Treffens enthalten | [2012/17] | English: | Mobile device and method for creating data records in the data-store of a calendar application based on the analysis of wirelessly transmitted messages containing information about the location, the time, the attendees and the confirmation of a meeting | [2012/17] | French: | Dispositif portable et procédé pour la création d'enregistrements de données dans la mémoire d'une application d'agenda basés sur l'analyse de messages radio contenant des informations sur le lieu, l'heure du rendez-vous, les participants et la confirmation d'une réunion | [2012/17] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2010 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 04.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.10.2010 | AL | 16.07.2014 | AT | 16.07.2014 | BE | 16.07.2014 | CY | 16.07.2014 | CZ | 16.07.2014 | DK | 16.07.2014 | EE | 16.07.2014 | ES | 16.07.2014 | FI | 16.07.2014 | HR | 16.07.2014 | IT | 16.07.2014 | LT | 16.07.2014 | LV | 16.07.2014 | MC | 16.07.2014 | MK | 16.07.2014 | MT | 16.07.2014 | PL | 16.07.2014 | RO | 16.07.2014 | RS | 16.07.2014 | SE | 16.07.2014 | SI | 16.07.2014 | SK | 16.07.2014 | SM | 16.07.2014 | TR | 16.07.2014 | BG | 16.10.2014 | NO | 16.10.2014 | GR | 17.10.2014 | IE | 20.10.2014 | LU | 20.10.2014 | CH | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | IS | 16.11.2014 | PT | 17.11.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 20.10.2010 | |
AT | 16.07.2014 | ||
BE | 16.07.2014 | ||
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
HR | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
MK | 16.07.2014 | ||
MT | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
SM | 16.07.2014 | ||
TR | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IE | 20.10.2014 | ||
LU | 20.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 20.10.2010 | |
AT | 16.07.2014 | ||
BE | 16.07.2014 | ||
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
HR | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
MT | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
SM | 16.07.2014 | ||
TR | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IE | 20.10.2014 | ||
LU | 20.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 20.10.2010 | |
AT | 16.07.2014 | ||
BE | 16.07.2014 | ||
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
HR | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
SM | 16.07.2014 | ||
TR | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IE | 20.10.2014 | ||
LU | 20.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
SM | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IE | 20.10.2014 | ||
LU | 20.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IE | 20.10.2014 | ||
LU | 20.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IE | 20.10.2014 | ||
LU | 20.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
LU | 20.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
LU | 20.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
LU | 20.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
LU | 20.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RS | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 16.07.2014 | |
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 16.07.2014 | |
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 16.07.2014 | |
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 16.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5790974 (TOGNAZZINI BRUCE [US]) [Y] 6,13 * column 1, line 51 - column 3, line 33 * * column 6, line 50 - column 7, line 31 * * column 8, line 57 - column 10, line 62 * * column 13, line 23 - line 43 * [A] 1-5,7-12,14,15; | [Y]US2002120703 (KAUFMAN JAMES H [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] , [0025] , [0042] * * paragraphs [0044] , [0048] , [0056] * * paragraphs [0058] , [0062] , [0065] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0070] *; | [A]US6446004 (CAO KEVIN TRUNG [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 62 - column 3, line 28 * * column 5, line 32 - column 6, line 7 * * column 7, line 17 - line 34 * * column 8, line 1 - line 11 * * column 8, line 40 - column 9, line 52 * * column 10, line 1 - line 29 *; | [YA]US6505167 (HORVITZ ERIC [US], et al) [Y] 4,5,11,12 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 7 * * column 5, line 37 - line 64 * * column 6, line 26 - column 7, line 15 * * column 7, line 27 - line 28 * * column 8, line 9 - line 21 * * column 8, line 63 - column 10, line 2 * [A] 1-3,6-10,13-15; | [A]EP1808802 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [A] 4,5,11,12 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraphs [0013] , [0020] , [0023] *; | [A]US2007281689 (ALTMAN SAMUEL H [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0041] , [0042] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058] *; | [A]US2009152349 (BONEV ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraphs [0074] , [0087] , [0092] * * paragraphs [0095] , [0101] , [0102] * * paragraphs [0116] , [0123] , [0124] * * paragraphs [0137] , [0141] , [0142] * * paragraph [0148] - paragraph [0154] * * paragraph [0159] - paragraph [0160] * * paragraphs [0167] , [0169] , [0173] * * paragraph [0175] - paragraph [0179] * * paragraph [0202] - paragraph [0203] * * paragraph [0213] - paragraph [0217] * * paragraph [0225] - paragraph [0227] * * paragraph [0236] - paragraph [0238] *; | [Y]US2009233628 (VENDEL MATTIAS [SE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] , [0038] , [0043] * * paragraphs [0052] , [0055] , [0056] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraphs [0083] , [0095] * * paragraphs [0129] , [0132] * * paragraph [0135] - paragraph [0143] *; | [A] - RIEKKI J ET AL, "Genie of the net, an agent platform for managing services on behalf of the user", COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 26, no. 11, ISSN 0140-3664, (20030701), pages 1188 - 1198, (20030701), XP027124533 [A] 1-15 * Chapters 3.1 and 3.2; page 1191, column l - page 1192, column l * * Chapter 4.1; page 1193, column r, line 3 - line 16 * * Chapter 4.2; page 1193, column r, line 24 - line 31 * |