EP2314536 - Locking assembly for Lifting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adams, William Mark Sutton Lodge 33 Town Street Sutton-Cum-Lound Retford Nottinghamshire DN22 8PT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/17] | For all designated states Adams, William Mark Sutton Lodge, 33 Town Street, Sutton-Cum-Lound Retford Nottinghamshire DN22 8PT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/17] | Representative(s) | Wood, Graham Bailey Walsh & Co LLP 1 York Place Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/17] | Wood, Graham Bailey Walsh & Co 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10188429.4 | 21.10.2010 | [2011/17] | Priority number, date | GB20090018754 | 26.10.2009 Original published format: GB 0918754 | [2011/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2314536 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B66F7/02, B66F7/28, B66F17/00, B66F7/04 | [2011/17] | CPC: |
B66F17/006 (EP,US);
B66F7/04 (EP,US);
B66F7/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Sperren einer Hebevorrichtung | [2011/17] | English: | Locking assembly for Lifting apparatus | [2011/17] | French: | Ensemble de blocage d'un appareil de levage | [2011/17] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/48] | 28.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/17] | 06.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2012/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4331219 (SUZUKI YASUNORI) [X] 1-15 * figure 3 * * claims 1-3 * * column 4, line 18 - column 5, line 50 *; | [X]FR2015612 (CECCATO & CO) [X] 1-15 * page 2, line 4 - page 3, line 1 * * figure 1 *; | [X]GB885599 (ESTABLISSEMENTS FOG) [X] 1-4,6-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1547964 (VIMA IMPIANTI S R L [IT]) [A] 5 * paragraphs [0070] - [0078] * * figures 4,5 * | by applicant | EP20060255129 |