EP2444171 - Transport system, transport vehicle and method for transporting metal coils [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens VAI Metals Technologies GmbH Turmstrasse 44 4031 Linz / AT | [2012/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofer, Roland Ottenschlag 20 4204 Reichenau / AT | 02 /
Gatterbauer, Roland Eigenheimweg 4 4020 Linz / AT | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10188451.8 | 22.10.2010 | [2012/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2444171 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B21C47/24, B61B13/00, B65G35/06, B66F9/06 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
B21C47/24 (EP,KR,US);
B61L27/00 (US);
B61B13/00 (KR);
B61B13/12 (US);
B61J1/04 (US);
B65G35/06 (KR);
B66F9/06 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Transportsystem, Transportwagen und Verfahren zum Transport von Metallbunde | [2012/17] | English: | Transport system, transport vehicle and method for transporting metal coils | [2012/17] | French: | Système de transport, chariot transporteur et procédé de transport de bobines métalliques | [2012/17] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/17] | 04.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3658011 (WEST CURTIS C, et al) [Y] 1-20 * column 1, line 4 - line 32 * * column 2, line 4 - line 7 * * column 4, line 6 - line 26 * * column 5, line 45 - line 52; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0061557 (VOEST ALPINE AG [AT]) [A] 1,4-6,11,14-16 * page 2, line 5 - line 19 * * page 3, line 11 - line 28 * * page 5, line 5 - line 15 * * page 6, line 5 - line 32; figures 1-5 *; | [XA]DE19626966 (CEGELEC AEG ANLAGEN UND AUTOMA [DE]) [X] 21,22 * column 1, line 35 - line 59 * * column 3, line 24 - line 33 * * column 4, line 25 - column 5, line 19; figures 1-4 * [A] 1-3,11-13; | [YA]DE19637771 (KOENIG & BAUER ALBERT AG [DE]) [Y] 10 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 19 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 1; figure 1 *[A] 1,11; | [Y]JPH10119784 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD, et al) [Y] 24 * abstract *; | [A]WO03026915 (LJU INDUSTRIEELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,4-6,11,14-16 * page 2, line 17 - page 3, line 35 * * page 5, line 1 - line 11 * * page 6, line 33 - page 7, line 1 * * page 7, line 20 - page 9, line 21; figures 1,5 *; | [A]DE102005008555 (SEW EURODRIVE GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-3,11-13 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0038]; figure 1; claims 1,6 *; | [XYI]WO2009153050 (SMS MEER GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 21,22 * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 1 - page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 4; figures 1,2 * [Y] 1-20,24 [I] 23 |