EP2305329 - A system for providing reduced-pressure wound treatment to a tissue site [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/14] | Reduced pressure, compression systems and apparatuses for use on joints | ||
[2013/20] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KCI Licensing, Inc. P.O. Box 659508 San Antonio, TX 78265-9508 / US | [2011/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cavanaugh, Matthew Francis 18822 Avignon Dr. San Antonio, TX 78258 / US | 02 /
Long, Justin Alexander 6335 Mustang Point Dr. San Antonio, TX 78240 / US | 03 /
Kazala, Richard Marvin Jnr. 16331 Persimmon Well San Antonio, TX 78247 / US | 04 /
Barta, Eric Woodson 14003 Cedar Mill San Antonio, TX 78231 / US | [2013/42] |
Former [2011/14] | 01 /
Cavanaugh, Matthew Francis 18822 Avignon Dr. San Antonio, TX 78258 / US | ||
02 /
Long, Justin Alexander 6335 Mustang Point Dr. San Antonio, TX 78240 / US | |||
03 /
Kazala, Richard Marvin Jnr. 16331 Persimmon Well San Antonio, TX 78247 / US | |||
04 /
Barta, Eric Woodson 14003 Cedar Mill San Antonio, TX 78231 / US | Representative(s) | Cordina, Kevin John, et al CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | Cordina, Kevin John, et al Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | ||
Former [2012/13] | Ashton, Timothy, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/14] | Ashton, Timothy Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10188492.2 | 29.05.2009 | [2011/14] | Priority number, date | US20080057797P | 30.05.2008 Original published format: US 57797 P | US20080057810P | 30.05.2008 Original published format: US 57810 P | US20080057805P | 30.05.2008 Original published format: US 57805 P | US20080057798P | 30.05.2008 Original published format: US 57798 P | US20080057807P | 30.05.2008 Original published format: US 57807 P | US20080057802P | 30.05.2008 Original published format: US 57802 P | US20080057800P | 30.05.2008 Original published format: US 57800 P | US20080057808P | 30.05.2008 Original published format: US 57808 P | US20080057803P | 30.05.2008 Original published format: US 57803 P | US20080121362P | 10.12.2008 Original published format: US 121362 P | US20090144067P | 12.01.2009 Original published format: US 144067 P | [2011/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2305329 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2305329 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2305329 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/00, A61F13/02, A61L15/42 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
A61F13/022 (EP,CN,US);
A61F13/0289 (EP,CN,US);
A61F13/00059 (US);
A61F13/01017 (US);
A61F13/01029 (US);
A61F13/01034 (US);
A61F13/01038 (US);
A61F13/0209 (EP,CN,US);
A61F13/0223 (EP,CN,US);
A61F13/0243 (EP,CN,US);
A61F13/05 (EP,CN,US);
A61F15/008 (EP,US);
A61H1/008 (EP,US);
A61L15/60 (EP,CN,US);
A61M1/71 (EP,CN,US);
A61M1/915 (EP,CN,US);
A61M1/917 (EP);
A61F13/00 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00131 (US);
A61F2013/00136 (US);
A61F2013/00174 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2013/00182 (US);
A61F2013/00246 (US);
A61F2013/0028 (US);
A61F2013/00536 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2013/0054 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2013/00748 (EP,CN,US);
A61M1/916 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2205/70 (US);
A61M2207/00 (US);
A61M2210/1007 (EP,US);
A61M2210/1021 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/14] | Title | German: | VERBANDANORDNUNGEN ZUR WUNDBEHANDLUNG MIT REDUZIERTEM DRUCK | [2013/17] | English: | A system for providing reduced-pressure wound treatment to a tissue site | [2013/20] | French: | STRUCTURES DE PANSEMENT POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE BLESSURES UTILISANT UNE PRESSION RÉDUITE | [2013/17] |
Former [2011/14] | Verbandanordnungen zur Wundbehandlung mit reduziertem Druck | ||
Former [2011/14] | Reduced pressure, compression systems and apparatuses for use on joints | ||
Former [2011/14] | Structures de pansement pour le traitement de blessures utilisant une pression réduite | Examination procedure | 27.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 06.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09770668.3 / EP2279019 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090770668) is 11.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.2014
22.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE Smith and Nephew, Inc. 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, TN 38116 / US Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.2014
22.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE Smith and Nephew, Inc. 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, TN 38116 / US Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | 21.08.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 16.11.2015 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2016/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.05.2009 | AT | 16.10.2013 | BE | 16.10.2013 | BG | 16.10.2013 | CY | 16.10.2013 | CZ | 16.10.2013 | DK | 16.10.2013 | EE | 16.10.2013 | ES | 16.10.2013 | FI | 16.10.2013 | HR | 16.10.2013 | LT | 16.10.2013 | LV | 16.10.2013 | MC | 16.10.2013 | MT | 16.10.2013 | NL | 16.10.2013 | PL | 16.10.2013 | RO | 16.10.2013 | SE | 16.10.2013 | SI | 16.10.2013 | SK | 16.10.2013 | TR | 16.10.2013 | NO | 16.01.2014 | GR | 17.01.2014 | IS | 16.02.2014 | PT | 17.02.2014 | IE | 29.05.2014 | LU | 29.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | [2022/27] |
Former [2019/38] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
GR | 17.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
IE | 29.05.2014 | ||
LU | 29.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
GR | 17.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
IE | 29.05.2014 | ||
LU | 29.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
IE | 29.05.2014 | ||
LU | 29.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
IE | 29.05.2014 | ||
LU | 29.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
LU | 29.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
LU | 29.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
LU | 29.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
LU | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 16.10.2013 | |
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 16.10.2013 | |
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 16.10.2013 | |
NO | 16.01.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1845630 (SCHOLL WILLIAM M) [A] 1 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]DE2505906 (NIERHAUS & CO FRIEDR [DE]) [A] 1* figures 2,4 *; | [A]DE3907522 (WEILLER MATTHIAS) [A] 1 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 2 * * figures 1-2 *; | [A]US6071267 (ZAMIEROWSKI DAVID S [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, lines 13-36 * * column 4, lines 35-40 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]US2006079852 (BUBB STEPHEN K [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 33 * |