EP2369501 - Information processing apparatus, information processing method, data management server and data synchronization system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2020 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2011/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Esaka, Seiji c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
Kaneko, Takeru C/o Visionarts, Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Takada, Masayuki c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 04 /
Sonoda, Shuhei c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2011/39] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/39] | Horner, David Richard D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10188729.7 | 25.10.2010 | [2011/39] | Priority number, date | JP20090276947 | 04.12.2009 Original published format: JP 2009276947 | [2011/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2369501 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2369501 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2011/39] | CPC: |
G06F16/275 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Informationsverarbeitungsvorrichtung, Informationsverarbeitungsverfahren, Datenverwaltungsserver und Datensynchronisationssystem | [2011/39] | English: | Information processing apparatus, information processing method, data management server and data synchronization system | [2011/39] | French: | Appareil de traitement d'informations, procédé de traitement d'informations, serveur de gestion de données et système de synchronisation de données | [2011/39] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/39] | 16.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2019 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 11.01.2019 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 17.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/10] | 25.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.05.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0208957 (APPLIEDTHEORY CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 19, line 1 - page 19, line 6 ** page 24, line 17 - page 25, line 6 *; | [Y] - "SyncML sync protocol, version 1.0", SYNCML SYNC PROTOCOL, XX, XX, (20001207), no. version 1.0, pages 1 - 60, XP002955174 [Y] 1-15 * pages 7-10 * * page 46 * | [Y] - FLOYD R ET AL, "MOBILE WEB ACCESS USING ENETWORK WEB EXPRESS", IEEE PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETY, US, (19981001), vol. 5, no. 5, doi:10.1109/98.729724, ISSN 1070-9916, pages 47 - 52, XP000786616 [Y] 1-15 * page 49, column l, paragraph last - page 49, column r, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/98.729724 | Examination | US6493721 | US2005125513 | - ANONYMOUS, "METHOD TO REDUCE CHANGED DATA SENT BETWEEN COMPUTER SYSTEMS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORP. (THORNWOOD), US, (19920601), vol. 35, no. 1B, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 110 - 112, XP000308991 | by applicant | JP2004086800 | JP2009276947 |