EP2322082 - Fundus imaging using adaptive optics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nozato, Koji c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-cho Tokyo Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
Miyata, Kazuhide c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-cho Tokyo Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2011/20] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2011/20] | Application number, filing date | 10188820.4 | 26.10.2010 | [2011/20] | Priority number, date | JP20090262386 | 17.11.2009 Original published format: JP 2009262386 | [2011/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2322082 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/12, A61B3/14, // A61B3/117 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
A61B3/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Abbildung des Augenhintergrunds mittels adaptiver Optiken | [2011/20] | English: | Fundus imaging using adaptive optics | [2011/20] | French: | Imagerie du fond de l'oeil par optique adaptive | [2011/20] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 11.11.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008225228 (SAITO NORIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,9,12 * figures 1,6 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0050] - [0054] - [0078] - [0082] * [I] 3,4,7,10,11; | [XI]WO03020121 (UNIV ROCHESTER [US], et al) [X] 1,9,12 * figure 1 * * page 12, line 13 - line 21 * * page 13, line 20 - page 14, line 9 * [I] 2-8,10,11; | [XI]GB2429522 (UNIV KENT CANTERBURY [GB], et al) [X] 1,9,10,12 * figure 1 * * page 24, line 31 - page 27, line 9 * [I] 2-8,11; | [A]US2007273830 (LEVINE BRUCE M [US]) [A] 7 * paragraphs [0146] , [0147] * | [XI] - FERNANDEZ E J ET AL, "Three-dimensional adaptive optics ultrahigh-resolution optical coherence tomography using a liquid crystal spatial light modulator", VISION RESEARCH, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 45, no. 28, ISSN 0042-6989, (20051201), pages 3432 - 3444, (20051201), XP027298129 [X] 1,9,10,12 * figures 1,2 * * chapter 2; page 3433 - page 3435 * * page 3433, column l, line 4 - line 34 * [I] 2-8,11 | by applicant | - Y. ZHANG, OPTICS EXPRESS, (20060515), vol. 14, no. 10 |