EP2363554 - Lock assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETABLISSEMENTS DECAYEUX 24, Rue Jules Guesde 80210 Feuquières-en-Vimeu / FR | [2011/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Decayeux, Antoine 24, rue Jules Guesde 80210 Feuquières-en-Vimeu / FR | [2011/36] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | Hirsch & Associés 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 10189009.3 | 27.10.2010 | [2011/36] | Priority number, date | FR20100051586 | 04.03.2010 Original published format: FR 1051586 | [2011/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2363554 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E05B27/00, E05B29/00 | [2011/36] | CPC: |
E05B29/0013 (EP);
E05B27/0035 (EP);
E05B27/0042 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schliesseinrichtung | [2011/36] | English: | Lock assembly | [2011/36] | French: | Serrure et ensemble d'une serrure et d'une clé | [2011/36] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/16] | 13.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/40] | 02.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8710037U (WINKHAUS GMBH) [A] 1 * figures 1a-2f, 4a,4b,6 *; | [A]DE19509337 (TITAN TOVARNA KOVINSKIH IZDELK [SI]) [A] 1 * figures 2,4 *; | [A]FR2864134 (FICHET SERRURERIE BATIMENT FSB [FR]) [A] 1 * figures 1-12 *; | [A]EP0633373 (WINKHAUS AUGUST GMBH CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 6a,7 *; | [A]GB2266918 (BURTON STEPHEN ARTHUR [AU]) [A] 1 * figures 8-10 * |