EP2448115 - Audio amplifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2016 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2012/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huijser, Jan-Paul c/o NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing Department High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Schouten, Marcus Maria NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2015/23] |
Former [2012/18] | Schouten, Marcus Maria NXP B.V. IP & Licensing Department High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 10189200.8 | 28.10.2010 | [2012/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2448115 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2448115 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/217, H03F3/68, H03F3/72, H04R5/04 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
H03F3/217 (EP,US);
H03F3/68 (EP,US);
H03F3/72 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/23] |
Former [2012/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Audioverstärker | [2012/18] | English: | Audio amplifier | [2012/18] | French: | Amplificateur audio | [2012/18] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 11.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.10.2010 | AL | 03.06.2015 | AT | 03.06.2015 | BE | 03.06.2015 | CY | 03.06.2015 | CZ | 03.06.2015 | DK | 03.06.2015 | EE | 03.06.2015 | ES | 03.06.2015 | FI | 03.06.2015 | HR | 03.06.2015 | IT | 03.06.2015 | LT | 03.06.2015 | LV | 03.06.2015 | MC | 03.06.2015 | MK | 03.06.2015 | MT | 03.06.2015 | NL | 03.06.2015 | PL | 03.06.2015 | RO | 03.06.2015 | RS | 03.06.2015 | SE | 03.06.2015 | SI | 03.06.2015 | SK | 03.06.2015 | SM | 03.06.2015 | TR | 03.06.2015 | BG | 03.09.2015 | NO | 03.09.2015 | GR | 04.09.2015 | IS | 03.10.2015 | PT | 06.10.2015 | IE | 28.10.2015 | LU | 28.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 28.10.2010 | |
AT | 03.06.2015 | ||
BE | 03.06.2015 | ||
CY | 03.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
MK | 03.06.2015 | ||
MT | 03.06.2015 | ||
NL | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SE | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
SM | 03.06.2015 | ||
TR | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
IE | 28.10.2015 | ||
LU | 28.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 28.10.2010 | |
AT | 03.06.2015 | ||
BE | 03.06.2015 | ||
CY | 03.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
MT | 03.06.2015 | ||
NL | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SE | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
SM | 03.06.2015 | ||
TR | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
IE | 28.10.2015 | ||
LU | 28.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
BE | 03.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
IE | 28.10.2015 | ||
LU | 28.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
IE | 28.10.2015 | ||
LU | 28.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
LU | 28.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
LU | 28.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
LU | 28.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 03.06.2015 | |
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 03.06.2015 | |
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2006078378 (ATMEL CORP [US]) [X] 1,8-10,12 * figures 2, 3 *[I] 11; | [XI]WO2009077816 (FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTOR INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,11,12 * figures 1, 5 * [I] 4,8,10 |