EP2447461 - Drive system for coil elements of sun blind and securing devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ProVita Verwaltung GmbH Haingruendauer Strasse 87 63584 Gruendau / DE | [2012/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lott, Oswald / Haingründauer Strasse 87 63584 Gründau / DE | 02 /
Müller, Wolfgang J. / Feldgasse 3 6890 Lustenau / AT | 03 /
Grübel, Edwin / Meierenaustrasse 47 9443 Widnau / CH | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Staudt, Armin Walter Sandeldamm 24a 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Staudt, Armin Walter Patentanwalt Sandeldamm 24a 63450 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 10189220.6 | 28.10.2010 | [2012/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2447461 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/70, F16H37/04 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
E06B9/70 (EP);
F16H1/28 (EP);
F16H37/041 (EP);
E06B2009/785 (EP);
F16H1/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Antriebssystem für Wickelelemente von Sonnenschutz- und Sicherungseinrichtungen | [2012/18] | English: | Drive system for coil elements of sun blind and securing devices | [2012/18] | French: | Système d'entraînement pour éléments de bobinage de dispositifs de protection solaire et de sécurisation | [2012/18] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/22] | 11.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]DE202006012081U (POZZI CARLO MAURIZIO [CH]) [X] 1,6,7,14 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0017] * [A] 5 [Y] 2-4,10 [I] 9; | [YA]US2003230389 (SAVARD NORMAND [CA], et al) [Y] 2-4 * figures 2,3,4,6 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0034] , [0043] , [0060] * [A] 5; | [Y]GB2410072 (YAN JASON [TW]) [Y] 10 * figures 2,3,4,5 * | by applicant | DE102007005595 | WO2008006758 | DE102004012354 | DE3636855 |