EP2450701 - Adjustable wedge for ultrasound testing heads [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2013 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clossen-von Lanken Schulz, Michael Vorsterstraße 34 47661, Issum / DE | 02 /
Obermayr, Stefan Mühlenstr. 211 45475, Mülheim / DE | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/19] | Application number, filing date | 10189847.6 | 03.11.2010 | [2012/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2450701 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/22 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
G01N29/221 (EP);
G01N29/2487 (EP);
G01N2291/2693 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verstellbarer Vorsatzkeil für Ultraschallprüfköpfe | [2012/19] | English: | Adjustable wedge for ultrasound testing heads | [2012/19] | French: | Courroie d'adaptateur réglable pour têtes de contrôle à ultrasons | [2012/19] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/20] | 18.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/20] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]KR200174618Y (KOREA ELECTRIC POWER CORP [KR]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * [I] 7-10; | [X]EP1804036 (FLOWTEC AG [CH]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0045]; figures 2,7,7a *; | [XI]US2602102 (WEBB ROBERT H) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * [I] 8-10; | [X]US4852416 (BOONE BRUCE T [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * line 28 - column 1, line 45 *; | [X]FR1065907 (CONDENSATION APPLICATION MEC) [X] 1-3,5 * page 2, line 4 - line 15; figure 3 *; | [X]JPS55155245 (HITACHI ENG CO LTD) [X] 1,2,7-10 * the whole document *; | [X]JPS54153690 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * |