EP2322708 - Domestic appliance with heat exchanger composed of material comprising thermoplastic and such a heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heyer-Wevers, Marcus Krumme Str. 86 10585 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Steusloff, Philipp Markgraf-Albrecht-Str. 3 10711 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Stolze, Andreas Leinestr. 1a 14612 Falkensee / DE | [2011/20] | Application number, filing date | 10190071.0 | 05.11.2010 | [2011/20] | Priority number, date | DE20091046680 | 13.11.2009 Original published format: DE102009046680 | [2011/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2322708 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2322708 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/24, C23C16/26, F28F21/06 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
D06F58/24 (EP,US);
F28F21/02 (EP);
F28F21/06 (EP);
F28F2255/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Hausgerät mit Wärmetauscher aus thermoplastischem Kunststoff enthaltendem Werkstoff, sowie solcher Wärmetauscher | [2011/20] | English: | Domestic appliance with heat exchanger composed of material comprising thermoplastic and such a heat exchanger | [2011/20] | French: | Appareil ménager doté d'un échangeur thermique en matière synthétique thermoplastique, et un tel échangeur thermique | [2011/20] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 24.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/10] | 02.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.05.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE19958106 (JOMA POLYTEC KUNSTSTOFFTECHNIK [DE]) [AD] 1-13* column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 7; figure 1 *; | [X]DE112004002463T (USUI KOKUSAI SANGYO KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,12,13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 25] , [0 90] , [0 94] , [0 99] , [ 100]; figure 6 *; | [X]WO2009005029 (TECHNES CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,9,12 * page 2, line 47 - line 50 * * page 3, line 26 - line 48 * * page 4, line 15 - line 18; figure 3; claim 9 * | by applicant | WO0069958 | DE19958106 | DE10218274 | DE20221788U | US2007232748 | US2009134363 |