EP2325029 - Spherical swivel module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/21] | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bröker, Klaus Lerchenstraße 7 49163, Bohmte / DE | 02 /
Nordloh, Alfons Goldenstedter Straße 71 49429, Visbek / DE | [2014/28] |
Former [2011/21] | 01 /
Bröker, Klaus Lerchenstraße 7 49163, Bohmte / DE | ||
02 /
Nordloh, Alfons Goldenstedter Straße 71 49429, Visbek / DE | Application number, filing date | 10190414.2 | 09.11.2010 | [2011/21] | Priority number, date | DE20091046931 | 20.11.2009 Original published format: DE102009046931 | [2011/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2325029 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2325029 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60D1/54, F16C11/10, F16C11/06 | [2011/21] | CPC: |
B60D1/54 (EP);
F16C11/069 (EP);
F16C11/106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/21] | Title | German: | Kugelschwenkmodul | [2011/21] | English: | Spherical swivel module | [2011/21] | French: | Module de basculement de sphère | [2011/21] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/21] | 21.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 10.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.11.2010 | AL | 09.07.2014 | CY | 09.07.2014 | CZ | 09.07.2014 | DK | 09.07.2014 | EE | 09.07.2014 | ES | 09.07.2014 | FI | 09.07.2014 | HR | 09.07.2014 | IT | 09.07.2014 | LT | 09.07.2014 | LV | 09.07.2014 | MC | 09.07.2014 | MK | 09.07.2014 | MT | 09.07.2014 | NL | 09.07.2014 | PL | 09.07.2014 | RO | 09.07.2014 | RS | 09.07.2014 | SE | 09.07.2014 | SI | 09.07.2014 | SK | 09.07.2014 | SM | 09.07.2014 | TR | 09.07.2014 | BG | 09.10.2014 | NO | 09.10.2014 | GR | 10.10.2014 | GB | 09.11.2014 | IE | 09.11.2014 | IS | 09.11.2014 | LU | 09.11.2014 | PT | 10.11.2014 | BE | 30.11.2014 | CH | 30.11.2014 | LI | 30.11.2014 | FR | 01.12.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 09.11.2010 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
MK | 09.07.2014 | ||
MT | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
RS | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
SM | 09.07.2014 | ||
TR | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
GB | 09.11.2014 | ||
IE | 09.11.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 09.11.2010 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
MT | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
RS | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
SM | 09.07.2014 | ||
TR | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
GB | 09.11.2014 | ||
IE | 09.11.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 09.11.2010 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
RS | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
SM | 09.07.2014 | ||
TR | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
GB | 09.11.2014 | ||
IE | 09.11.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
RS | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
SM | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
GB | 09.11.2014 | ||
IE | 09.11.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
RS | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
GB | 09.11.2014 | ||
IE | 09.11.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/48] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
RS | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
GB | 09.11.2014 | ||
IE | 09.11.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
RS | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IE | 09.11.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
RS | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
RS | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
RS | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
RS | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
RS | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RS | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 09.07.2014 | |
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 09.07.2014 | |
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 09.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE202005014499U (MVG METALLVERARBEITUNGSGMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0029] , [0032] - paragraph [0035] * * figures 1,5,6 *; | [A]EP2017097 (WESTFALIA AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0025] * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP2042353 (WESTFALIA AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0058] * * figures 1,4,7 *; | [AP]WO2009143934 (TRW AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE], et al) [AP] 1* abstract * |