EP2287214 - Use and application of defined zwitterionic copolymer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2011/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sherry, Alan Edward 90 Watch Hill Lane Newport, KY 41071 / US | [2012/30] |
Former [2011/08] | 01 /
Sherry, Alan Edward 90 Watch Hill Lane Newport, KY 41071 / US | Representative(s) | Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2011/08] | Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 10190480.3 | 17.11.2006 | [2011/08] | Priority number, date | US20050737822P | 17.11.2005 Original published format: US 737822 P | [2011/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2287214 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2287214 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08F20/00 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
C08F220/60 (EP,US);
C08F220/06 (EP,US);
C08F226/04 (EP,US);
C11D17/049 (US);
C11D3/3723 (US);
C11D3/3796 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/08] | Title | German: | Verwendung und Applikation von definiertem zwitterionischem Copolymer | [2011/08] | English: | Use and application of defined zwitterionic copolymer | [2011/08] | French: | Utilisation et application de copolymères zwitterioniques définis | [2011/08] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 03.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06821491.5 / EP1948702 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060821491) is 13.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.11.2006 | AT | 25.07.2012 | BE | 25.07.2012 | CY | 25.07.2012 | CZ | 25.07.2012 | DK | 25.07.2012 | EE | 25.07.2012 | FI | 25.07.2012 | LT | 25.07.2012 | LV | 25.07.2012 | PL | 25.07.2012 | RO | 25.07.2012 | SE | 25.07.2012 | SI | 25.07.2012 | SK | 25.07.2012 | TR | 25.07.2012 | BG | 25.10.2012 | GR | 26.10.2012 | ES | 05.11.2012 | IE | 17.11.2012 | LU | 17.11.2012 | IS | 25.11.2012 | PT | 26.11.2012 | CH | 30.11.2012 | LI | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
TR | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IE | 17.11.2012 | ||
LU | 17.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
TR | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IE | 17.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IE | 17.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 25.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0110213 (RHODIA CHIMIE SA [FR], et al) [I] 1-18 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6569261 | US4387017 | EP0156646 | US4565647 | US5776872 | US5883062 | US5906973 | WO8605199 | US2082275 | US2702279 | US2255082 | US2658072 | US2438091 | US2528378 | US4076648 | US4021365 | US4749740 | US4983316 | EP0150872 | EP0217501 | EP0499364 | WO9960089 | US6045622 | US3699103 | US3770731 | US32649 | US4834735 | US4076663 | US4062817 | US3661875 | US4093776 | US4666983 | US4734478 | US5147343 | US5149335 | US19940219547 | US19950416396 |