EP2377501 - MATRIX-CONSTRUCTION PADDED ABSORBING ARTICLE AND MAKING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/42] | Matrix-construction padded absorbing article and making method therefor | ||
[2019/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corman S.p.A. Via Liguria, 3 SP40 KM.1.300 20084 Lacchiarella / IT | [2020/12] |
Former [2020/10] | For all designated states Corman S.p.A. SP40 KM.1.300 20084 Lacchiarella Milano / IT | ||
Former [2011/42] | For all designated states Corman S.p.A. Via Sciesa, 10 20084 Lacchiarella MI / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Conio, Guido c/o CORMAN S.p.A. Via Sciesa, 10 I-20084, Lacchiarella (MI) / IT | 02 /
Mantovani, Giorgio c/o CORMAN S.p.A. Via Sciesa, 10 I-20084, Lacchiarella (MI) / IT | [2011/42] | Representative(s) | Rastelli, Franco Dott. Franco Cicogna & C. SRL Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A 20122 Milano / IT | [2020/07] |
Former [2011/42] | Cicogna, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 10190691.5 | 10.11.2010 | [2011/42] | Priority number, date | IT2009MI01998 | 13.11.2009 Original published format: IT MI20091998 | [2011/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2377501 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2377501 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2377501 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/53 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
A61F13/15626 (EP,US);
A61F13/53 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/42] | A61F13/15 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/42] | Title | German: | MIT MATRIXKONSTRUKTION GEPOLSTERTER ABSORPTIONSARTIKEL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2019/49] | English: | MATRIX-CONSTRUCTION PADDED ABSORBING ARTICLE AND MAKING METHOD THEREFOR | [2019/49] | French: | ARTICLE ABSORBANT MATELASSÉ À CONSTRUCTION DE TYPE MATRICE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2019/49] |
Former [2011/42] | Mit Matrixkonstruktion gepolsterter Absorptionsartikel und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | ||
Former [2011/42] | Matrix-construction padded absorbing article and making method therefor | ||
Former [2011/42] | Article absorbant matelassé à construction de type matrice et son procédé de fabrication | Examination procedure | 26.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 02.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.11.2010 | AL | 12.02.2020 | AT | 12.02.2020 | CY | 12.02.2020 | DK | 12.02.2020 | EE | 12.02.2020 | FI | 12.02.2020 | HR | 12.02.2020 | LT | 12.02.2020 | LV | 12.02.2020 | MC | 12.02.2020 | MK | 12.02.2020 | MT | 12.02.2020 | PL | 12.02.2020 | RO | 12.02.2020 | RS | 12.02.2020 | SI | 12.02.2020 | SK | 12.02.2020 | SM | 12.02.2020 | TR | 12.02.2020 | BG | 12.05.2020 | NO | 12.05.2020 | PT | 05.07.2020 | GB | 10.11.2020 | IE | 10.11.2020 | LU | 10.11.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 10.11.2010 | |
AL | 12.02.2020 | ||
AT | 12.02.2020 | ||
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
GB | 10.11.2020 | ||
IE | 10.11.2020 | ||
LU | 10.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 10.11.2010 | |
AT | 12.02.2020 | ||
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
GB | 10.11.2020 | ||
IE | 10.11.2020 | ||
LU | 10.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
GB | 10.11.2020 | ||
IE | 10.11.2020 | ||
LU | 10.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
GB | 10.11.2020 | ||
IE | 10.11.2020 | ||
LU | 10.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
GB | 10.11.2020 | ||
IE | 10.11.2020 | ||
LU | 10.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
IE | 10.11.2020 | ||
LU | 10.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
LU | 10.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | DK | 12.02.2020 | |
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | DK | 12.02.2020 | |
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 12.02.2020 | |
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 12.02.2020 | |
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
NO | 12.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4610678 (WEISMAN PAUL T [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 7 * * column 6, lines 30-42 * * column 7, lines 52-65 * * column 8, lines 5-34 * * column 10, lines 6-9 * * column 14, lines 33-36 * * figure -; claim - *; | [X]US4902559 (ESCHWEY HELMUT [DE], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 1, lines 10-16 * * column 2, lines 32-47 * * column 6, lines 14-29 * * figure -; claims 1-14 *; | [Y]US2003118814 (WORKMAN JEROME JAMES [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0003] , [0011] , [0012] , [0024] , [0000] , [0068]; figure -; claims 1,15,24,25,26 *; | [Y]US2003116888 (RYMER TIMOTHY JAMES [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * figure -; claim - * | Examination | US5681300 | US5356403 | EP1078616 | US2006069365 |