EP2282520 - Digital camera [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/06] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueda, Hiroshi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IR Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Honjo, Kenichi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IR Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Yumiki, Naoto c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IR Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
Makabe, Toshio c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IR Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
Maeda, Kenji c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IR Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 06 /
Mokunaka, Kaoru c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IR Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 07 /
Ishimaru, Kazuhiko c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IR Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2011/06] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/06] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10190804.4 | 30.11.2006 | [2011/06] | Priority number, date | JP20050351936 | 06.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005351936 | [2011/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2282520 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2282520 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232 | [2011/06] | CPC: |
G03B19/12 (EP,US);
H04N23/00 (KR);
H04N23/66 (US);
G03B19/00 (EP,US);
H04N23/635 (EP,US);
H04N23/651 (EP,US);
H04N23/667 (EP,US);
H04N23/673 (EP,US);
H04N23/75 (EP,US);
H04N23/672 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Digitalkamera | [2011/06] | English: | Digital camera | [2011/06] | French: | Appareil photo numerique | [2011/06] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 06.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/17] | 16.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06833803.7 / EP1962498 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060833803) is 04.06.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000122172 (FUJI PHOTO OPTICAL CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-10* abstract * | Examination | US2001026683 | US2005110897 | by applicant | JP2001272593 |