EP2322311 - Device for laser spot welding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JENOPTIK Automatisierungstechnik GmbH Konrad-Zuse-Strasse 6 07745 Jena / DE | [2011/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wollmann, Werner Carolinenstrasse 28 07747 Jena / DE | 02 /
Krämer, Wilfried Liselotte-Hermann-Strasse 12 07747 Jena / DE | 03 /
Langebach, Jan Lange Strasse 45 07551 Gera / DE | 04 /
Fischbach, Sven Neuer Weg 3 06686 Starsiedel / DE | [2016/18] |
Former [2011/20] | 01 /
Wollmann, Werner Carolinenstrasse 28 07747 Jena / DE | ||
02 /
Krämer, Wilfried Liselotte-Hermann-Strasse 12 07747 Jena / DE | |||
03 /
Dr. Langebach, Jan Lange Strasse 45 07551 Gera / DE | |||
04 /
Fischbach, Sven Neuer Weg 3 06686 Starsiedel / DE | Representative(s) | Schaller, Renate, et al Gleim Petri Oehmke Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Neugasse 13 07743 Jena / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/18] | Schaller, Renate, et al Patentanwälte Oehmke & Kollegen Neugasse 13 07743 Jena / DE | ||
Former [2011/20] | Schaller, Renate, et al Patentanwälte Oehmke & Kollegen Neugasse 13 07743 Jena / DE | Application number, filing date | 10190868.9 | 11.11.2010 | [2011/20] | Priority number, date | DE20091053261 | 11.11.2009 Original published format: DE102009053261 | [2011/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2322311 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2322311 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/02, B23K26/073, B23K26/22 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
B23K26/037 (EP,US);
B23K26/0732 (EP,US);
B23K26/22 (EP,US);
B29C65/1635 (EP,US);
B29C65/1667 (EP,US);
B29C65/1674 (EP,US);
B29C65/1687 (EP,US);
B29C66/112 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/131 (EP,US);
B29C66/21 (EP,US);
B29C66/47 (EP,US);
B29C66/474 (EP,US);
B29C66/8242 (EP,US);
B29C66/8266 (EP,US);
B29C66/8322 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] |
Former [2011/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Punktschweißen mit Laserstrahl | [2011/20] | English: | Device for laser spot welding | [2011/20] | French: | Dispositif de soudage par point au laser | [2011/20] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 10.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.11.2010 | AL | 04.05.2016 | BG | 04.05.2016 | CY | 04.05.2016 | CZ | 04.05.2016 | DK | 04.05.2016 | EE | 04.05.2016 | ES | 04.05.2016 | FI | 04.05.2016 | HR | 04.05.2016 | IS | 04.05.2016 | IT | 04.05.2016 | LT | 04.05.2016 | LV | 04.05.2016 | MC | 04.05.2016 | MK | 04.05.2016 | MT | 04.05.2016 | NL | 04.05.2016 | PL | 04.05.2016 | RO | 04.05.2016 | RS | 04.05.2016 | SE | 04.05.2016 | SI | 04.05.2016 | SK | 04.05.2016 | SM | 04.05.2016 | TR | 04.05.2016 | NO | 04.08.2016 | GR | 05.08.2016 | PT | 05.09.2016 | AT | 11.11.2016 | GB | 11.11.2016 | IE | 11.11.2016 | BE | 30.11.2016 | FR | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 11.11.2010 | |
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
MT | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
TR | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
AT | 11.11.2016 | ||
GB | 11.11.2016 | ||
IE | 11.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 11.11.2010 | |
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
TR | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
AT | 11.11.2016 | ||
GB | 11.11.2016 | ||
IE | 11.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 11.11.2010 | |
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
TR | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
AT | 11.11.2016 | ||
GB | 11.11.2016 | ||
IE | 11.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 11.11.2010 | |
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
TR | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
AT | 11.11.2016 | ||
GB | 11.11.2016 | ||
IE | 11.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 11.11.2010 | |
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
AT | 11.11.2016 | ||
GB | 11.11.2016 | ||
IE | 11.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
AT | 11.11.2016 | ||
GB | 11.11.2016 | ||
IE | 11.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
GB | 11.11.2016 | ||
IE | 11.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 11.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 04.05.2016 | |
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 04.05.2016 | |
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 04.05.2016 | |
NO | 04.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS61225885 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [Y] 1-12 * abstract *; | [YD]DE10005593 (EXNER HORST [DE], et al) [YD] 1-12 * example 1 *; | [Y]US6713713 (CALDWELL SCOTT [US], et al) [Y] 6,8 * figure - *; | [Y]EP2036653 (TECNOLASER S R L [IT]) [Y] 9,11* paragraph [0019]; figure - * | by applicant | DE10005593 |