EP2453062 - Method and system for bracing excavations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marti AG Bern, Moosseedorf Bernstrasse 13 3302 Moosseedorf / CH | [2012/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Minotto, Alessandro Route du Bugnon 45 1752 Villars-sur-Glâne / CH | 02 /
Reinhard, Christian Rüttihubelstrasse 532 3077 Enggistein / CH | 03 /
Barone, Albino -- CH-3053 Münchenbuchsee / CH | [2013/10] |
Former [2012/20] | 01 /
Minotto, Alessandro Route du Bugnon 45 1752 Villars-sur-Glâne / CH | ||
02 /
Reinhard, Christian Rüttihubelstrasse 532 3077 Enggistein / CH | Representative(s) | BOVARD AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3013 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/20] | BOVARD AG Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 10191340.8 | 16.11.2010 | [2012/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2453062 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2453062 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E02D17/04, E02D17/08 | [2012/20] | CPC: |
E02D17/04 (EP);
E02D17/08 (EP);
E02D17/083 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/07] |
Former [2012/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Spriessung von Baugruben | [2012/20] | English: | Method and system for bracing excavations | [2012/20] | French: | Procédé et système d'étai pour travaux de terrassement | [2012/20] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2012 | Examination requested [2012/52] | 03.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.11.2010 | AL | 17.02.2016 | CY | 17.02.2016 | CZ | 17.02.2016 | DK | 17.02.2016 | EE | 17.02.2016 | ES | 17.02.2016 | FI | 17.02.2016 | HR | 17.02.2016 | IS | 17.02.2016 | LT | 17.02.2016 | LV | 17.02.2016 | MC | 17.02.2016 | MK | 17.02.2016 | MT | 17.02.2016 | NL | 17.02.2016 | PL | 17.02.2016 | RO | 17.02.2016 | RS | 17.02.2016 | SE | 17.02.2016 | SI | 17.02.2016 | SK | 17.02.2016 | SM | 17.02.2016 | TR | 17.02.2016 | BG | 17.05.2016 | NO | 17.05.2016 | GR | 18.05.2016 | PT | 17.06.2016 | GB | 16.11.2016 | IE | 16.11.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 16.11.2010 | |
CY | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
IS | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
MK | 17.02.2016 | ||
MT | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
TR | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
GB | 16.11.2016 | ||
IE | 16.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 16.11.2010 | |
CY | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
IS | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
MK | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
TR | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
GB | 16.11.2016 | ||
IE | 16.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 16.11.2010 | |
CY | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
MK | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
TR | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
GB | 16.11.2016 | ||
IE | 16.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 16.11.2010 | |
CY | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
MK | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
GB | 16.11.2016 | ||
IE | 16.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
GB | 16.11.2016 | ||
IE | 16.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | CZ | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 17.02.2016 | |
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 17.02.2016 | |
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | ES | 17.02.2016 | |
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 17.02.2016 | |
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 17.02.2016 | |
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2956409 (WICKE GLENN J) [X] 1,6,7,9-11,15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0029]; figures 2,3,4 *; | [A]US3710578 (INOUE T) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0095193 (EMUNDS JOSEF) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2166774 (MABEY HIRE CO) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2246480 (ISCHEBECK FRIEDRICH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * |