EP2316328 - Wrap-around holding device for use with bronchoscopes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/18] | System of accessories for use with bronchoscopes | ||
[2011/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Super Dimension Ltd. P.O. Box 2045 Herzeliya 46120 / IL | [2011/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greenburg, Benny 16 Lotem St. 45100, Hod Hasharon / IL | 02 /
Belcher, Danny 10 Yehuda St. 52504, Ramat Gan / IL | 03 /
Griefner, Gil 12 Itamar St. 52531, Ramat Gan / IL | 04 /
Becker, Heinrich c/o Super Dimension Ltd. P.O. Box 2045 46120, Herzeliya / IL | [2012/19] |
Former [2011/18] | 01 /
Greenburg, Benny 16 Lotem St. 45100, Hod Hasharon / IL | ||
02 /
Belcher, Danny 10 Yehuda St. 52504, Ramat Gan / IL | |||
03 /
Griefner, Gil 12 Itamar St. 52531, Ramat Gan / IL | |||
04 /
Becker, Heinrich c/o Super Dimension Ltd. P.O. Box 2045 46120, Herzeliya / IL | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/18] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10191689.8 | 14.09.2004 | [2011/18] | Priority number, date | US20030502615P | 15.09.2003 Original published format: US 502615 P | US20040550346P | 08.03.2004 Original published format: US 550346 P | US20040564944P | 26.04.2004 Original published format: US 564944 P | [2011/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2316328 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2316328 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/04, A61B1/005, A61B19/00, A61B1/018, A61B1/267 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
A61B1/0005 (EP,US);
A61B1/00128 (EP,US);
A61B1/00137 (EP,US);
A61B1/0014 (EP,US);
A61B1/00147 (EP,US);
A61B1/0052 (EP,US);
A61B1/012 (EP,US);
A61B1/018 (EP,US);
A61B1/042 (EP,US);
A61B1/05 (EP,US);
A61B1/2676 (EP,US);
A61B5/06 (US);
A61B5/062 (EP,US);
A61B5/415 (EP,US);
A61B5/418 (EP,US);
A61B6/032 (US);
A61B6/037 (US);
A61B8/13 (US);
|
Former IPC [2011/18] | A61B1/04, A61B1/005, A61B19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/18] | Title | German: | Umhüllungsvorrichtung zur Fixierung von Bronchoskopen | [2011/44] | English: | Wrap-around holding device for use with bronchoscopes | [2011/44] | French: | Dispositif de fixation à enroulement pour utilisation avec des bronchoscopes | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/18] | System aus Zubehör zur Verwendung mit Bronchoskopen | ||
Former [2011/18] | System of accessories for use with bronchoscopes | ||
Former [2011/18] | Système d'accessoires pour utilisation avec des bronchoscopes | Examination procedure | 09.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 10.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04770514.0 / EP1667749 | EP09157586.0 / EP2113189 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040770514) is 20.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.09.2004 | CY | 09.05.2012 | CZ | 09.05.2012 | DK | 09.05.2012 | EE | 09.05.2012 | FI | 09.05.2012 | NL | 09.05.2012 | PL | 09.05.2012 | RO | 09.05.2012 | SE | 09.05.2012 | SI | 09.05.2012 | SK | 09.05.2012 | TR | 09.05.2012 | BG | 09.08.2012 | GR | 10.08.2012 | PT | 10.09.2012 | IE | 14.09.2012 | LU | 14.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
TR | 09.05.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
IE | 14.09.2012 | ||
LU | 14.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
TR | 09.05.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
IE | 14.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
IE | 14.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
IE | 14.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 09.05.2012 | |
SE | 09.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5728047 (EDOGA JOHN K [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0224054 (PILLING WECK INC [US], et al) [A] 1-4* figure 1 * | by applicant | WO03086498 |