EP2354138 - Compounds and compositions for treatment of cancer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sunesis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 395 Oyster Point Blvd., Suite 400 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2011/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adelman, Daniel, C. 23 Woodleaf Avenue Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | 02 /
Evanchik, Marc, J. 3558 Vista Del Valle San Jose, CA 95132 / US | 03 /
Jacobs, Jeffrey, William 505 Cornell Avenue San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | 04 /
Silverman, Jeffrey, A. 1416 Columbus Avenue Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | 05 /
Sudhakar, Anantha 42356 Troyer Avenue Fremont, CA 94539 / US | [2011/32] | Representative(s) | Weber, Martin, et al Jones Day Rechtsanwälte Attorneys-at-Law Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | Piening, Niklas, et al Jones Day Prinzregentenstraße 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10192053.6 | 12.06.2007 | [2011/32] | Priority number, date | US20060812835P | 12.06.2006 Original published format: US 812835 P | [2011/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2354138 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/14, A61P31/00 | [2011/32] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/4375 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4745 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4745, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/32] | Extension states | AL | 10.02.2012 | BA | 10.02.2012 | HR | 10.02.2012 | MK | 10.02.2012 | RS | 10.02.2012 | Title | German: | Verbindungen und Zusammensetzungen zur Behandlung von Krebs | [2011/32] | English: | Compounds and compositions for treatment of cancer | [2011/32] | French: | Composés et compositions pour le traitement du cancer | [2011/32] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 16.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/45] | 04.10.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.10.2017 | 11.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07796066.4 / EP2043645 | Divisional application(s) | EP17190312.3 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070796066) is 11.05.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 28.11.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 28.11.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.12.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH09221424 (DAINIPPON PHARMACEUTICAL CO) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y]US5817669 (TOMITA KYOJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y] - TSUZUKI ET AL, "Synthesis and Structure-Activity Relationships of Novel 7-Substituted 1,4-Dihydro-4-oxo-1-(2-thiazolyl)-1,8-naphthyridine-3-carboxylic Acids as Antitumor Agents. Part 2", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20040101), vol. 47, no. 8, doi:10.1021/JM0304966, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2097 - 2109, XP002352356 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm0304966 | [Y] - TSUZUKI Y ET AL, "Synthesis and structure-activity relationships of 3-substituted 1,4-dihydro-4-oxo-1-(2-thiazolyl)-1,8-naphthyridines as novel antitumor agents", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB, (20040621), vol. 14, no. 12, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2004.04.011, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 3189 - 3193, XP004841372 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2004.04.011 | [X] - TSUZUKI Y ET AL, "Practical synthesis of (3S,4S)-3-methoxy-4-methylaminopyrrolidine", TETRAHEDRON ASYMMETRY, PERGAMON PRESS LTD, OXFORD, GB, (20011126), vol. 12, no. 21, doi:10.1016/S0957-4166(01)00530-4, ISSN 0957-4166, pages 2989 - 2997, XP004331590 [X] 1-7 * page 2989, column 2, line 1 - line 4; figure Scheme 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0957-4166(01)00530-4 | [X] - TSUZUKI Y ET AL, "Efficient stereospecific synthesis of (S,S)-3-methoxy-4-methylaminopy rrolidine", TETRAHEDRON ASYMMETRY, PERGAMON PRESS LTD, OXFORD, GB, (20010716), vol. 12, no. 12, doi:10.1016/S0957-4166(01)00302-0, ISSN 0957-4166, pages 1793 - 1799, XP004298263 [X] 1-8 * page 1796, line 7 - line 9; figures Scheme 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0957-4166(01)00302-0 | [Y] - CHIBA KATSUMI ET AL, PRACTICAL SYNTHESIS OF AG-7352, AN OPTICALLY ACTIVE NEW ANTITUMOR AGENT, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. ABSTRACTS OF PAPER. AT THE NATIONAL MEETING, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, PAGE(S) ORG127, (19990101), ISSN 0065-7727, XP008073733 [Y] 1-8 * page 3, paragraph 127 * | by applicant | US4810643 | US4999291 | US5134127 | US5229496 | US5391485 | US5393870 | US5528823 | US5580755 | JPH10173986 | US5817669 | US2005203120 | US2005215583 | US2006025437 | US2006034699 | - TSUZUKI ET AL., J. MED CHEM., (2004), vol. 47, pages 2097 - 2106 | - TOMITA ET AL., J MED CHEM., (2002), vol. 45, pages 5564 - 5575 | - TSUZUKI ET AL., J MED. CHEM., (2004), vol. 47, pages 2097 - 2106 | - TOMITA ET AL., J MED. CHEM., (2002), vol. 45, pages 5564 - 5575 | - PENICHET, M.L.; MORRISON, S.L., J IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2001), vol. 248, pages 91 - 101 | - EMENS, L.A. ET AL., CURR. OPINION MOL. THER., (2001), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 77 - 84 | - PHYSICIANS' DESK REFERENCE, (2002), pages 1755 - 1760 |