EP2335641 - Structure for connecting a mixing tip to a cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seil Global Corporation 715-1 Choryang 3-Dong Dong-ku Busan 601-827 / KR | [2011/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
An, Im Jun c/o SEIL GLOBAL CO., LTD. 715-1, Choryang 3-Dong Dong-gu Busan / KR | [2013/28] |
Former [2011/25] | 01 /
An, Im Jun c/o SEIL GLOBAL CO., LTD. 715-1, Choryang 3-Dong Dong-gu Busan / KR | Representative(s) | Staudt, Hans-Peter, et al Staudt IP Law Donaustrasse 7 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | Staudt, Hans-Peter, et al Bittner & Partner Intellectual Property Division Donaustrasse 7 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 10192085.8 | 22.11.2010 | [2011/25] | Priority number, date | KR20090126589 | 18.12.2009 Original published format: KR 20090126589 | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2335641 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2335641 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61C9/00, B05C17/005 | [2011/25] | CPC: |
A61C9/0026 (EP,US);
A61C9/00 (KR);
B01F35/00 (KR);
B05C17/00509 (EP,US);
B05C17/00553 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/25] | Title | German: | Struktur zum Verbinden einer Mischdüse mit einer Kartusche | [2011/25] | English: | Structure for connecting a mixing tip to a cartridge | [2011/25] | French: | Structure pour raccorder un embout de mélangeur sur une cartouche | [2013/07] |
Former [2011/25] | Structure pour raccorder un embout de mélange sur une cartouche | Examination procedure | 05.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/02] | 25.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.11.2010 | AL | 10.07.2013 | AT | 10.07.2013 | BE | 10.07.2013 | BG | 10.07.2013 | CY | 10.07.2013 | CZ | 10.07.2013 | DK | 10.07.2013 | EE | 10.07.2013 | FI | 10.07.2013 | HR | 10.07.2013 | LT | 10.07.2013 | LV | 10.07.2013 | MC | 10.07.2013 | MK | 10.07.2013 | MT | 10.07.2013 | NL | 10.07.2013 | PL | 10.07.2013 | RO | 10.07.2013 | SE | 10.07.2013 | SI | 10.07.2013 | SK | 10.07.2013 | SM | 10.07.2013 | TR | 10.07.2013 | NO | 10.10.2013 | RS | 10.10.2013 | GR | 11.10.2013 | IS | 10.11.2013 | PT | 11.11.2013 | IE | 22.11.2013 | LU | 22.11.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 22.11.2010 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
MK | 10.07.2013 | ||
MT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
SM | 10.07.2013 | ||
TR | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
RS | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
IE | 22.11.2013 | ||
LU | 22.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 22.11.2010 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
MK | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
SM | 10.07.2013 | ||
TR | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
RS | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
IE | 22.11.2013 | ||
LU | 22.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
MK | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
SM | 10.07.2013 | ||
TR | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
IE | 22.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
SM | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
IE | 22.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
IE | 22.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 10.07.2013 | |
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | SI | 10.07.2013 | |
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | SI | 10.07.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5413253 (SIMMEN CHRISTIAN [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 4, lines 41-44,56 - column 5, line 3 * * column 7, line 58 - column 8, lines 2,9-14; figures 1-3,7,8,13 *; | [A]EP1125641 (KELLER WILHELM A [CH]) [A] 1* figures 38-44 *; | [A]DE202006014087U (MUEHLBAUER ERNST GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] , [0028]; figures 1-6B *; | [A]US2008029542 (KELLER WILHELM A [CH]) [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [0029] , [0033] - [0035]; figures 1,4,6,7 * |