EP2312519 - Method and system for providing integrated brokerage and other financial services through customer activated terminals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CITIBANK, N.A. 32nd floor, 909 Third Avenue New York, NY 10043 / US | [2011/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sidikman, Paul 30 Badger Drive Livingston, NJ 07039 / US | 02 /
Weiss, Lawrence D. 2138 Lakeview Lane Skaneateles, NY 13152 / US | [2011/16] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10192100.5 | 07.06.1996 | [2011/16] | Priority number, date | US19950483710 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 483710 | [2011/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2312519 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q40/00 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
G06Q20/18 (EP,US);
G06Q20/1085 (EP,US);
G06Q40/04 (EP,US);
G06Q40/06 (EP,US);
G07F19/20 (EP,US);
G07F19/211 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2011/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Bereitstellung eines integrierten Maklergeschäfts und anderer Finanzdienstleistungen durch kundenaktivierte Endgeräte | [2011/16] | English: | Method and system for providing integrated brokerage and other financial services through customer activated terminals | [2011/16] | French: | Procédé et système permettant de fournir un courtage intégré et autres services financiers par le biais de terminaux activés par un client | [2011/16] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/48] | 26.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/29] | 06.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/29] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96919061.0 / EP0870249 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19960919061) is 12.11.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 22.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9306546 (VAJK HUGO [US]) [I] 1-16 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - page 4, line 6 ** page 5, line 5 - page 9, line 36 *; | [I]WO9412954 (WILSON SHEILA [CA]) [I] 1-16 * abstract * * page 1, line 6 - page 6, line 7 * * page 6, line 27 - page 10, line 2 *; | [A]WO9510081 (ATM COMMUNICATIONS INT [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | Examination | US5220501 | by applicant | USRE30773E | US4376978 | US4597046 | US4674044 | US4774663 | US4991199 | US5088927 | US5195130 | US5270922 | US5321840 |