EP2458694 - Terminal assembly and method for connecting an electric wire to a terminal element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Nederland B.V. Rietveldenweg 32 5222 AR's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Nederland B.V. Rietveldenweg 32 5222 AR 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | ||
Former [2012/22] | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Nederland B.V. Rietveldenweg 32 5222 AR's-Hertogenbosch / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Tilburg, Jan Suikerkampstraat 32 5345GJ, Oss / NL | 02 /
Scheefhals, Fred De Houtbreker 9 5283ME, Boxtel / NL | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10192412.4 | 24.11.2010 | [2012/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2458694 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2458694 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/10, H01R43/04, H05K3/32 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
H01R4/10 (EP,US);
H01R4/183 (US);
H01R43/04 (EP,US);
H05K1/117 (EP,US);
H05K3/325 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09745 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/22] | H01R43/04, H01R4/10, H05K3/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Title | German: | Anschlussanordnung und Verfahren zum Verbinden einer Leiters an ein Anschlusselement | [2012/22] | English: | Terminal assembly and method for connecting an electric wire to a terminal element | [2012/22] | French: | Ensemble de connexion et procédé pour connecter un fil électrique à un élément du connexion | [2012/22] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2011 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 10.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.11.2010 | AL | 26.06.2013 | AT | 26.06.2013 | BE | 26.06.2013 | CY | 26.06.2013 | CZ | 26.06.2013 | DK | 26.06.2013 | EE | 26.06.2013 | FI | 26.06.2013 | HR | 26.06.2013 | LT | 26.06.2013 | LV | 26.06.2013 | MC | 26.06.2013 | MK | 26.06.2013 | MT | 26.06.2013 | PL | 26.06.2013 | RO | 26.06.2013 | RS | 26.06.2013 | SE | 26.06.2013 | SI | 26.06.2013 | SK | 26.06.2013 | SM | 26.06.2013 | TR | 26.06.2013 | BG | 26.09.2013 | NO | 26.09.2013 | GR | 27.09.2013 | ES | 07.10.2013 | IS | 26.10.2013 | PT | 28.10.2013 | IE | 24.11.2013 | LU | 24.11.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 24.11.2010 | |
AT | 26.06.2013 | ||
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
MK | 26.06.2013 | ||
MT | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
SM | 26.06.2013 | ||
TR | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
IE | 24.11.2013 | ||
LU | 24.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 24.11.2010 | |
AT | 26.06.2013 | ||
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
MK | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
SM | 26.06.2013 | ||
TR | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
IE | 24.11.2013 | ||
LU | 24.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
MK | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
SM | 26.06.2013 | ||
TR | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
IE | 24.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
MK | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
SM | 26.06.2013 | ||
TR | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
IE | 24.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
SM | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
IE | 24.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
IE | 24.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | BE | 26.06.2013 | |
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
RS | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 26.06.2013 | |
NO | 26.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1049522 (PHILIPS NV) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]FR1279798 (AMP INC) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US3355698 (RICHARD KELLER JOSEPH) [X] 1-3,5-10,12-15* the whole document *; | [XI]GB1505676 (AMP INC [US]) [X] 1-5,7-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 65 - line 69 * * page 2, line 18 - line 34 * * page 2, line 47 - line 95 * * figures 3-10 * [I] 6; | [XI]WO9001817 (BAKELIT KONSTR AB [SE]) [X] 1-5,7-15 * the whole document * [I] 6; | [XI]FR2935550 (LEGRAND SNC [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,7-15 * the whole document * [I] 6 |