EP2458368 - Recording device for recording a blood count parameter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states eesy-id GmbH Akilindastraße 10a 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | For all designated states Friedrich-Alexander-Universität Erlangen-Nürnberg Schlossplatz 4 91054 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | For all designated states eesy-id GmbH Akilindastraße 10a 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | ||
For all designated states Friedrich-Alexander-Universität Erlangen-Nürnberg Schlossplatz 4 91054 Erlangen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Georg Bielefelder Str. 23b 90425 Nürnberg / DE | [2014/10] |
Former [2012/22] | 01 /
Fischer, Georg Bielefelder Str. 23b 90425, Nürnberg / DE | Representative(s) | Klinski, Robert, et al Patentship Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elsenheimerstraße 65 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | Klinski, Robert, et al PATENTSHIP Patentanwaltskanzlei Elsenheimerstraße 65 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10192469.4 | 24.11.2010 | [2012/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2458368 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2458368 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/17, A61B5/145 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
A61B5/0507 (EP,US);
G16B45/00 (US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/6824 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Title | German: | Erfassungsvorrichtung zum Erfassen eines Blutbildparameters | [2012/22] | English: | Recording device for recording a blood count parameter | [2012/22] | French: | Dispositif de détection pour la détection d'un paramètre d'hémogramme | [2012/22] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 08.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.11.2010 | AL | 23.07.2014 | CY | 23.07.2014 | CZ | 23.07.2014 | DK | 23.07.2014 | EE | 23.07.2014 | FI | 23.07.2014 | HR | 23.07.2014 | LT | 23.07.2014 | LV | 23.07.2014 | MC | 23.07.2014 | MK | 23.07.2014 | MT | 23.07.2014 | PL | 23.07.2014 | RO | 23.07.2014 | RS | 23.07.2014 | SE | 23.07.2014 | SI | 23.07.2014 | SK | 23.07.2014 | SM | 23.07.2014 | TR | 23.07.2014 | BG | 23.10.2014 | NO | 23.10.2014 | GR | 24.10.2014 | IS | 23.11.2014 | IE | 24.11.2014 | LU | 24.11.2014 | PT | 24.11.2014 | BE | 30.11.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
MK | 23.07.2014 | ||
MT | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
RS | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
SM | 23.07.2014 | ||
TR | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
IE | 24.11.2014 | ||
LU | 24.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
MT | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
RS | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
SM | 23.07.2014 | ||
TR | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
IE | 24.11.2014 | ||
LU | 24.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
RS | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
SM | 23.07.2014 | ||
TR | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
IE | 24.11.2014 | ||
LU | 24.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
RS | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
SM | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
IE | 24.11.2014 | ||
LU | 24.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
RS | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
IE | 24.11.2014 | ||
LU | 24.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
RS | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
IE | 24.11.2014 | ||
LU | 24.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
RS | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
LU | 24.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
RS | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
LU | 24.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
RS | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
RS | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RS | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 23.07.2014 | |
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 23.07.2014 | |
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 23.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006025664 (KIM DONG-KYUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0020] - [0050]; figure 5 *; | [XI]US2009275814 (WATANABE SHINSUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,10,11,14,15 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0088]; figure 1 * [I] 5,12,13; | [A]WO2010131029 (MICROSENSE LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15* page 10, line 10 - page 11, line 24 * | by applicant | - ANDREAS CADUFF ET AL., "Non-invasive glucose monitoring in patients with Type 1 diabetes: A multi-sensor system combining sensors for dielectric and optical characterization of skin", BIOSENSORS AND BIOELECTRONICS, (2009), vol. 24, pages 2778 - 2784 |