EP2353916 - Method for controlling a coupling assembly and power transmission for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GETRAG B.V. & Co. KG Hermann-Hagenmeyer-Strasse 74199 Untergruppenbach / DE | [2017/13] |
Former [2011/32] | For all designated states GETRAG Getriebe- und Zahnradfabrik Hermann Hagenmeyer GmbH & Cie KG Hermann-Hagenmeyer-Strasse 74199 Untergruppenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Höck, Michael Märzweiher 11 53819, Neunkirchen-Seelscheid / DE | 02 /
Niessen, Harwin Von-Geyr-Ring 102 50354, Hürth / DE | [2017/01] |
Former [2011/32] | 01 /
Höck, Michael Märzweiher 11 53819, Neunkirchen-Seelscheid / DE | ||
02 /
Niessen, Harwin Von-Geyr-Ring 102 50354, Hürth / DE | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/01] |
Former [2011/32] | Witte, Weller & Partner Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 10192485.0 | 25.11.2010 | [2011/32] | Priority number, date | DE20101005065 | 13.01.2010 Original published format: DE102010005065 | [2011/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2353916 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2353916 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60K17/02, B60K23/08, B60W30/02, B60W30/18 | [2011/32] | CPC: |
B60K17/02 (EP);
B60K23/04 (EP);
B60K23/08 (EP);
B60W10/02 (EP);
B60W30/18172 (EP);
B60W2510/0241 (EP);
B60W2510/0275 (EP);
B60W2510/0283 (EP);
B60W2510/104 (EP);
B60W2520/266 (EP);
B60W2520/28 (EP);
B60W2520/30 (EP);
B60W2552/40 (EP);
B60W2710/021 (EP);
B60W2710/027 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] |
Former [2011/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Ansteuerverfahren für eine Kupplungsanordnung sowie Antriebsstrang für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2011/32] | English: | Method for controlling a coupling assembly and power transmission for a motor vehicle | [2011/32] | French: | Procédé de commande pour un agencement d'embrayage et conducteur de commande pour un véhicule automobile | [2011/32] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 26.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.07.2016 | 18.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.11.2010 | AL | 04.01.2017 | CY | 04.01.2017 | CZ | 04.01.2017 | DK | 04.01.2017 | EE | 04.01.2017 | ES | 04.01.2017 | FI | 04.01.2017 | HR | 04.01.2017 | IT | 04.01.2017 | LT | 04.01.2017 | LV | 04.01.2017 | MC | 04.01.2017 | MK | 04.01.2017 | MT | 04.01.2017 | NL | 04.01.2017 | PL | 04.01.2017 | RO | 04.01.2017 | RS | 04.01.2017 | SE | 04.01.2017 | SI | 04.01.2017 | SK | 04.01.2017 | SM | 04.01.2017 | TR | 04.01.2017 | BG | 04.04.2017 | NO | 04.04.2017 | GR | 05.04.2017 | IS | 04.05.2017 | PT | 04.05.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 25.11.2010 | |
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MK | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
TR | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 25.11.2010 | |
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MK | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 25.11.2010 | |
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 25.11.2010 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | ES | 04.01.2017 | |
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE102007030091 (GETRAG DRIVELINE SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,7,8 * paragraphs [0006] , [0016] , [0019] - [0021] - [0047] - [0049] * * figures 2-4,6 * [Y] 2,5,6; | [XYI]US2007294018 (NIHANDA NORIHISA [JP]) [X] 1,7,8 * figures 1,2,5 * * paragraphs [0026] - [0028] - [0034] - [0037] - [0040] , [0044] - [0047] - [0066] , [0078] , [0084] * [Y] 2,3,5,6 [I] 2; | [Y]FR2808575 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [Y] 3 * page 2, lines 12-20 * * page 2, line 33 - page 3, line 21 * * page 4, line 6 - page 5, line 24 * * page 5, lines 30-32 * * page 6, lines 5-11 * * figure 3 *; | [Y]DE102006026188 (GETRAG DRIVELINE SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2 * paragraphs [0067] - [0069] * * claim 17 *; | [X]US2002139634 (PORTER FRED C [US]) [X] 4,8 * figure 2 * * claim 9 * | Examination | DE19836686 | DE102009039347 | DE102010043780 | by applicant | DE102004046008 |