EP2468269 - Nitric oxide donors in therapy of nitric oxide deficiency-induced disturbances of cerebral microcirculation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universitätsklinikum Münster Domagkstrasse 5 48149 Münster / DE | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Ganghoferstraße 68 B 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Schiweck, Weinzierl & Koch European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Straße 98 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10192669.9 | 26.11.2010 | [2012/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2468269 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/00, A61K31/4245, A61K31/454, A61K31/5377, A61K31/541, A61P9/10 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
A61K31/4245 (EP,US);
C07D271/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/454 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61K31/541 (EP,US);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Nitridoxidspender bei der Behandlung von Nitridoxidmangel-induzierten Störungen der Hirnmikrozirkulation | [2012/26] | English: | Nitric oxide donors in therapy of nitric oxide deficiency-induced disturbances of cerebral microcirculation | [2012/26] | French: | Donneurs d'oxyde nitrique pour la thérapie des perturbations induites par une déficience d'oxyde nitrique de la microcirculation cérébrale | [2012/26] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2012/47] | 14.07.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9918949 (UNIV JEFFERSON [US], et al) [X] 1,10-14 * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 2 * * page 11, line 23 - page 12, line 2 * * examples 2-3 * * claims 1-3,8-11 * [I] 15; | [XI] - SASAKI Y ET AL, "Effects of NO-donors on thrombus formation and microcirculation in cerebral vessels of the rat", THROMBOSIS AND HAEMOSTASIS, SCHATTAUER GMBH, DE; US, (19960701), vol. 76, no. 1, ISSN 0340-6245, pages 111 - 117, XP008135425 [X] 1-11 * the whole document * [I] 15 | [XI] - ZHANG F ET AL, "Nitric oxide donors increase blood flow and reduce brain damage in focal ischemia: evidence that nitric oxide is beneficial in the early stages of cerebral ischemia.", JOURNAL OF CEREBRAL BLOOD FLOW AND METABOLISM : OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY OF CEREBRAL BLOOD FLOW AND METABOLISM MAR 1994 LNKD- PUBMED:8113318, (199403), vol. 14, no. 2, ISSN 0271-678X, pages 217 - 226, XP002632925 [X] 1-11 * the whole document * [I] 15 | [XI] - ZHANG F ET AL, "Reduction of focal cerebral ischemic damage by delayed treatment with nitric oxide donors.", JOURNAL OF CEREBRAL BLOOD FLOW AND METABOLISM : OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY OF CEREBRAL BLOOD FLOW AND METABOLISM JUL 1994 LNKD- PUBMED:8014203, (199407), vol. 14, no. 4, ISSN 0271-678X, pages 574 - 580, XP002632926 [X] 1-11 * abstract * [I] 15 | [XI] - YAMAMOTO S ET AL, "Subarachnoid hemorrhage impairs cerebral blood flow response to nitric oxide but not to cyclic GMP in large cerebral arteries.", BRAIN RESEARCH 16 MAY 1997 LNKD- PUBMED:9200492, (19970516), vol. 757, no. 1, ISSN 0006-8993, pages 1 - 9, XP002632927 [X] 1-14 * abstract * * page 5 * * figure 3 * [I] 15 | [A] - MEGSON I L, "NITRIC OXIDE DONOR DRUGS", DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, PROUS SCIENCE, ES, (20000101), vol. 25, no. 7, doi:10.1358/DOF.2000.025.07.858691, ISSN 0377-8282, pages 701 - 715, XP008018362 [A] 1-15 * page 703, column r, paragraph l - page 704, column l, paragraph 1; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1358/dof.2000.025.07.858691 | [XI] - VAJKOCZY P ET AL, "Intrathecal sodium nitroprusside improves cerebral blood flow and oxygenation in refractory cerebral vasospasm and ischemia in humans", STROKE, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, US, (20000501), vol. 31, no. 5, ISSN 0039-2499, pages 1195 - 1197, XP008135441 [X] 1,10-14 * the whole document * [I] 15 | [XI] - RAABE ANDREAS ET AL, "Effect of intraventricular sodium nitroprusside on cerebral hemodynamics and oxygenation in poor-grade aneurysm patients with severe, medically refractory vasospasm", NEUROSURGERY, WILLIAMS & WILKINS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (20020501), vol. 50, no. 5, ISSN 0148-396X, pages 1006 - 1014, XP008135440 [X] 1,10-14 * the whole document * [I] 15 | [XI] - HÄNGGI D ET AL, "Nitric oxide in subarachnoid haemorrhage and its therapeutics implications", ACTA NEUROCHIRURGICA ; THE EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF NEUROSURGERY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, VI, (20060315), vol. 148, no. 6, doi:10.1007/S00701-005-0721-1, ISSN 0942-0940, pages 605 - 613, XP019430322 [X] 1,10-14 * abstract * * page 609, column l, paragraph 2 - page 611, column l, paragraph l * [I] 15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00701-005-0721-1 | [XI] - PLUTA R M ET AL, "Analysis of nitric oxide (NO) in cerebral vasospasm after aneursymal bleeding", REVIEWS ON RECENT CLINICAL TRIALS, BENTHAM SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NL, vol. 2, no. 1, ISSN 1574-8871, (20070101), pages 59 - 67, XP008135437 [X] 1,10-14 * the whole document * [I] 15 | [A] - OHKUMA H ET AL, "Impact of cerebral microcirculatory changes on cerebral blood flow during cerebral vasospasm after aneurysmal subarachnoid hemorrhage.", STROKE; A JOURNAL OF CEREBRAL CIRCULATION JUL 2000 LNKD- PUBMED:10884463, (200007), vol. 31, no. 7, ISSN 0039-2499, pages 1621 - 1627, XP002632928 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | US4962091 | WO9407529 | WO0162256 | US6359182 | WO0234705 | WO2008025731 | - Methods in Nitric Oxide Research, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1996), pages 71 - 115 | - BERND ROSENKRANZ ET AL., "Clinical Pharmacokinetics of Molsidomine", CLIN. PHARMACOKINET., (199605), vol. 30, no. 5, pages 372 - 384 | - E. W. MARTIN, Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING CO., (1975), pages 697 - 773 | - DORSCH, "Therapeutic approaches to vasospasm in subarachnoid hemorrhage", CURR. OPIN. CRIT. CARE, (2002), vol. 8, no. 2, pages 128 - 33 | - BIONDI ET AL., "Intra-arterial Nimodipine for the treatment of symptomatic cerebral vasospasm after aneurysmal subarachnoid hemorrhage: Preliminary results", AJNR AM. J. NEURORADIOL., (2004), vol. 25, pages 1067 - 76 | - PICKARD ET AL., "Effect of oral Nimodipine on cerebral infarction and outcome after subarachnoid haemorrhage: British aneurysm Nimodipine trial", BMJ, (1989), vol. 298, pages 636 - 42 | - WOERTGEN ET AL., "Comparison of the Claassen and Fisher CT classification scale to predict ischemia after aneurysmatic SAH. Zentralbl", NEUROCHIR., (2003), vol. 64, no. 3, pages 104 - 8 | - DORSCH, "Cerebral arterial spasm - a clinical review", BR. J. NEUROSURG., (1995), vol. 9, pages 403 - 12 | - CORSTEN ET AL., "Contemporary management of subarachnoid hemorrhage and vasospasm: the UIC experience", SURG. NEUROL., (2001), vol. 56, no. 3, pages 140 - 8 | - MOCCO ET AL., "A review of current and future medical therapies for cerebral vasospasm following aneurismal subarachnoid hemorrhage", NEUROSURG. FOCUS, (2006), vol. 21, no. 3, page E9 | - VERGOUWEN ET AL., "Microthrombosis after aneurysmal subarachnoid hemorrhage: an additional explanation for delayed cerebral ischemia", J. CEREB. BLOOD FLOW METAB., (2008), vol. 28, no. 11, pages 1761 - 70 | - OKHUMA ET AL., "Impact of cerebral microcirculatory changes on cerebral blood flow during cerebral vasospasm after aneurysmal subarachnoid hemorrhage", STROKE, (2000), vol. 31, no. 7, pages 1621 - 7 | - PLUTA ET AL., "Cerebral vasospasm following subarachnoid hemorrhage: Time for a new world of thought", NEUROL. RES., (2009), vol. 31, no. 2, pages 151 - 8 | - WEYER ET AL., "Evidence-based cerebral vasospasm management", NEUROSURG. FOCUS, (2006), vol. 21, page E8 | - RABINSTEIN ET AL., "Predictors of outcome after endovascular treatment of cerebral vasospasm", AM. J. NEURORADIOL., (2004), vol. 25, no. 10, pages 1778 - 82 | - ROMANO ET AL., "Microemboli in aneurysmal subarachnoid hemorrhage", J. NEUROIMAGING, (2008), vol. 18, no. 4, pages 396 - 401 | - MACDONALD, "An endothelin receptor antagonist for treatment of vasospasms after subarachnoid hemorrhage", EXPERT OPIN. INVESTIG. DRUGS, (2008), vol. 17, pages 1761 - 7 | - BARTH ET AL., "Effect of nicardipine prolonged-release implants on cerebral vasospasm and clinical outcome after severe aneurysmal subarachnoid hemorrhage: a prospective, randomized, double-blind phase Ila study", STROKE, (2007), vol. 38, no. 2, pages 330 - 6 | - FARACI; BRIAN, "Nitric oxide and the cerebral circulation", STROKE, (1994), vol. 25, no. 3, pages 692 - 703 | - LADECOLA ET AL., "Nitric oxide synthase inhibition and cerebrovascular regulation", J. CEREB. BLOOD FLOW METAB., (1994), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 175 - 92 | - MONCADA ET AL., "Nitric oxide: physiology, pathophysiology, and pharmacology", PHARMACOL. REV., (1991), vol. 43, no. 2, pages 109 - 42 | - BUSSE; MULSCH, "Induction of nitric oxide synthase by cytokines in vascular smooth muscle cells", FEBS LETTERS, (1990), vol. 275, pages 87 - 90 | - ALONSO ET AL., "Predominant role for nitric oxide in the relaxation induced by acetylcholine in cat cerebral arteries", J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (1992), vol. 261, pages 12 - 20 | - FARACI, "Role of endothelium-derived relaxing factor in cerebral circulation: Large arteries vs. microcirculation", AM. J. PHYSIOL., (1991), vol. 261, pages H1038 - 42 | - BUSSE ET AL., "The role of endothelium in the control of vascular tone", BASIC RES. CARDIOL., (1985), vol. 80, pages 475 - 90 | - KATUSIC; SHEPERD, "Endothelium-derived vasoactive factors: li. Endotehlium- dependent concentration", HYPERTENSION, (1991), vol. 18, pages 11186 - 92 | - HINO ET AL., "Changes in endothelial nitric oxide synthase mRNA during vasospasm after subarachnoid hemorrhage in monkeys", NEUROSURGERY, (1996), vol. 39, no. 3, pages 562 - 7 | - GALLE ET AL., "Arterial size determines the enhancement of contractile responses after suppression of endothelium-derived relaxing factor formation", PFLUGERS ARCH., (1993), vol. 422, pages 564 - 9 | - WELLMAN ET AL., "Nitric oxide and reactive oxygen species exert opposing effects on the stability of hypoxia-inducible factor-1 alpha (hif-1 alpha) in explants of human pial arteries", FASEB J., (2004), vol. 18, pages 379 - 81 | - HARDER ET AL., "Possible cellular mechanism for cerebral vasospasm after experimental subarachnoid hemorrhage in the dog", J. CLIN. INVEST., (1987), vol. 80, pages 875 - 80 | - ZUCCARELLO ET AL., "Prevention of subarachnoid hemorrhage-induced cerebral vasospasm by oral administration of endothelin receptor antagonists", J. NEUROSURG., (1996), vol. 84, pages 503 - 7 | - ANDALUZ ET AL., "Indications for endovascular therapy for refractory vasospasm after aneurysmal subarachnoid hemorrhage: Experience at the university of Cincinnati", SURG. NEUROL., (2002), vol. 58, pages 131 - 8 | - BONEV ET AL., "Activators of protein kinase c decrease ca2+ spark frequency in smooth muscle cells from cerebral arteries", AM. J. PHYSIOL., (1997), vol. 273, pages C2090 - 5 | - ISHIGURO ET AL., "Cellular basis of vasospasm: Role of small diameter arteries and voltage-dependent ca2+ channels", ACTA NEUROCHIR., (2008), vol. 104, pages 95 - 8 | - SCHINI ET AL., "Inducible nitric oxide synthase in vascular smooth muscle", ARZNEIMITTELFORSCHUNG, (1994), vol. 44, pages 432 - 5 | - GUO ET AL., "Mechanism of vascular preservation by a novel NO donor following rat caroti artery intimal injury", AM. J. PHYSIOL., (1995), vol. 269, pages H 1122 - 31 | - SCOTT-BURDEN ET AL., "Platelet-derived growth factor suppresses and fibroblast growth factor enhances cytokine-induced production of nitric oxide by cultured smooth muscle cells. Effects on cell proliferation", CIRC. RES., (1992), vol. 71, no. 5, pages 1088 - 1100 | - SCOTT-BURDEN; VANHOUTTE, "Regulation of smooth muscle cell growth by endothelium-derived factors", TEX. HEART INST. J., (1994), vol. 21, pages 91 - 7 | - SCHWARTZ ET AL., "The intima: Soil for atherosclerosis and restenosis", CIRC. RES., (1995), vol. 77, pages 445 - 65 | - JOLY ET AL., "Balloon injury and interleukin-1 beta induce nitric oxide synthase activity in rat carotid arteries", CIRC. RES., (1992), vol. 71, pages 331 - 8 | - GARG ET AL., "Nitric-oxide generating vasodilators and 8-bromo-cyclic guanosine monophosphate inhibit mitogenesis and proliferation of cultured rat vascular smooth muscle cells", J. CLIN. INVEST., (1989), vol. 83, pages 1774 - 7 | - MCNAMARA ET AL., "L-arginine inhibits balloon catheter-induced intimal hyperplasia", BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1993), vol. 193, pages 291 - 6 | - VON DER LEYEN ET AL., "Gene therapy inhibiting neointimal vascular lesion: In vivo transfer of endothelial cell nitric oxide synthase gene", PNAS, (1995), vol. 92, pages 1137 - 41 | - BASSENGE ET AL., "Inhibition of thrombocyte aggregation and adhesion by endothelium-derived relaxant factor (edrf) and their pathophysiologic significance", Z. KARDIOL., (1989), vol. 78, no. 6, pages 54 - 8 | - CAHILL PA; REDMOND EM; FOSTER C; SITZMANN JV, "Nitric oxide regulates angiotensin II receptors in vascular smooth muscle cells", EUR J PHARMACOL., (19950116), vol. 288, no. 2, pages 219 - 29 | - BOHME, "Pharmacology of molsidomine and its active metabolites", MED. KLIN. (MUNICH), (1990), vol. 85, no. 1, pages 7 - 10 | - RUBANYI, "Endothelium-derived relaxing and contracting factors", J. CELL BIOCHEM., (1991), vol. 46, pages 27 - 36 | - MACDONALD; WEIR, "A review of hemoglobin and the pathogenesis of cerebral vasospasm", STROKE, (1991), vol. 22, pages 971 - 82 | - COOK, "Mechanisms of cerebral vasospasm in subarachnoid haemorrhage", PHARMACOL. THER., (1995), vol. 66, pages 259 - 84 | - SEIFERT ET AL., "Endothelin concentrations in patients with aneurysmal subarachnoid hemorrhage. Correlation with cerebral vasospasm, delayed ischemic neurological deficits, and volume of hematoma", J. NEUROSURG., (1995), vol. 82, pages 55 - 62 | - VAJKOCZY ET AL., "Intrathecal sodium nitroprusside improves cerebral blood flow and oxygenation in refractory cerebral vasospasm and ischemia in humans", STROKE, (2000), vol. 31, pages 1195 - 7 | - RAABE ET AL., "Effect of intraventricular sodium nitroprusside on cerebral hemodynamics and oxygenation in poor-grade aneurysm patients with severe, medically refractory vasospasm", NEUROSURGERY, (2002), vol. 50, pages 1006 - 13 | - HIRSH, "Intra-arterial nitroprusside treatment of acute experimental vasospasm", STROKE, (1980), vol. 11, pages 601 - 5 | - WOLF ET AL., "Reversal of cerebral vasospasm using an intrathecally administered nitric oxide donor", J. NEUROSURG., (1998), vol. 89, pages 279 - 88 | - EGEMEN N; TüRKER RK; SANLIDILEK U; ZORLUTUNA A; BIIGIG S; BASKAYA M; UNIU A; CAGLAR S; SPETZLER RF; MCCORMICK JM, "The effect of intrathecal sodium nitroprusside on severe chronic vasospasm", NEUROL RES., (199310), vol. 15, no. 5, pages 310 - 5 | - THOMAS ET AL., "Rapid reversal of endothelin-1-induced cerebral vasoconstriction by intrathecal administration of nitric oxide donors", NEUROSURGERY, (1997), vol. 40, pages 1245 - 9 | - HEROS ET AL., "Reversal of experimental cerebral vasospasm by intravenous nitroprusside therapy", SURG. NEUROL., (1976), vol. 6, pages 227 - 9 | - GOKSEL ET AL., "The therapeutic effect of continuous intracisternal I-arginine infusion on experimental cerebral vasospasm", ACTA NEUROCHIR. (WIEN), (2001), vol. 143, pages 277 - 85 | - CASTHELY ET AL., "Cerebrospinal fluid cyanide after nitroprusside infusion in man", CAN. ANAESTH. SOC. J., (1981), vol. 28, pages 228 - 31 | - HECKER ET AL., "Elevation of circulating no: Its effects on hemodynamics and vascular smooth muscle cell proliferation in rats", AGENTS ACTIONS, (1995), vol. 45, pages 169 - 76 | - ROSENKRANZ ET AL., "Clinical pharmacokinetics of molsidomine", CLIN. PHARMACOKINET., (1996), vol. 30, pages 372 - 84 | - SERRUYS ET AL., "Long-acting coronary vasodilatory action of the molsidomine metabolite sin 1: A quantitative angiographic study", EUR. HEART J., (1987), vol. 8, pages 263 - 70 | - LOCH MACDONALD, "Management of cerebral vasospasm", NEUROSURG. REV., (2006), vol. 29, pages 179 - 93 | - PLUTA, "Delayed cerebral vasospasm and nitric oxide: Review, new hypothesis, and proposed treatment", PHARMACOL. THER., (2005), vol. 105, pages 23 - 56 | - KRAMER; FLETCHER, "Do endothelin-receptor antagonists prevent delayed neurological deficits and poor outcomes after aneurysmal subarachnoid hemorrhage?", A META-ANALYSIS. STROKE, (2009), vol. 40, pages 3403 - 6 | - VAN DEN BERGH ET AL., "Potentials of magnesium treatment in subarachnoid haemorrhage", MAGNES. RES., (2004), vol. 17, pages 301 - 13 | - KOMOTAR ET AL., "Advances in vasospasm treatment and prevention", J. NEUROL. SCI., (2007), vol. 261, pages 134 - 42 | - RINKEL; KLIJN, "Prevention and treatment of medical and neurological complications in patients with aneurysmal subarachnoid haemorrhage", PRACT. NEUROL., (2009), vol. 9, pages 195 - 209 | - SMITH ET AL., "Nitric oxide gas decreases endothelin-1 mRNA in cultured pulmonary artery endothelial cells", NITRIC OXIDE, (2002), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 153 - 9 | - WAGNER ET AL., "Modulation of circulating endothelin-1 and big endothelin by nitric oxide inhalation following left ventricular assist device implantation", CIRCULATION, (2003), vol. 108, no. 1, pages 11278 - 84 | - ASANO SHIMOKAWA H; SETO M; KATSUMATA N; AMANO M; KOZAI T; YAMAWAKI T; KUWATA K; KANDABASHI T; EGASHIRA K; IKEGAKI , ASANO T, "Rho-kinase-mediated pathway induces enhanced myosin light chain phosphorylations in a swine model of coronary artery spasm", CARDIOVASC RES., (199909), vol. 43, no. 4, pages 1029 - 39 | - CHITALEY K; WEBB RC, "Nitric oxide induces dilation of rat aorta via inhibition of rho-kinase signalling", HYPERTENSION, (200202), vol. 39, pages 438 - 42 | - KEYROUZ; DIRINGER, "Clinical review: Prevention and therapy of vasospasm in subarachnoid hemorrhage", CRITICAL CARE, (2007), vol. 11, no. 4, page 220 | - DE ROOIJ ET AL., "Incidence of subarachnoid haemorrhage: A systematic review with emphasis on region, age, gender and time trends", JOURNAL OF NEUROLOGY, NEUROSURGERY, AND PSYCHIATRY, (2007), vol. 78, no. 12, pages 1365 - 72 | - BASSENGE E; SCHNEIDER HT; DAIBER A., "Oxidative stress and cardiovascular diseases", DTSCH MED WOCHENSCHR., (20051216), vol. 130, no. 50, pages 2904 - 9 | - PLUTA RM; RAK R; WINK DA; WOODWARD JJ; KHALDI A; OLDFIELD EH; WATSON JC, "Effects of nitric oxide on reactive oxygen species production and infarction size after brain reperfusion injury", NEUROSURGERY, (200104), vol. 48, no. 4, pages 884 - 92 | - PLUTA RM; THOMPSON BG; AFSHAR JK; BOOCK RJ; LULIANO B; OLDFIELD EH, "Nitric oxide and vasospasm", ACTA NEUROCHIR, (2001), vol. 77, pages 67 - 72 | - MACDONALD RL; KASSELL NF; MAYER S; RUEFENACHT D; SCHMIEDEK P; WEIDAUER S; FREY A; ROUX S; PASQUALIN A, "CONSCIOUS-1 Investigators", STROKE, (200811), vol. 39, no. 11, pages 3015 - 21 | - PEARL JD; MACDONALD RL, "Vasospasm after aneurysmal subarachnoid hemorrhage: need for further study", ACTA NEUROCHIR, vol. 12008, no. 105, pages 207 - 10 | - SOBEY CG; FARACI FM, "Subarachnoid haemorrhage: what happens to the cerebral arteries?", CLIN EXP PHARMACOL PHYSIOL., (199811), vol. 25, no. 11, pages 867 - 76 | - DIRNAGL U; BECKER K; MEISEL A, "Preconditioning and tolerance against cerebral ischaemia: from experimental strategies to clinical use", LANCET NEUROL., (200904), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 398 - 412 | - XING B; CHEN H; ZHANG M; ZHAO D; JIANG R; LIU X; ZHANG S, "Ischemic postconditioning inhibits apoptosis after focal cerebral ischemia/reperfusion injury in the rat", STROKE, (200808), vol. 39, no. 8, pages 2362 - 9 | - ZHAO L; NOWAK TS JR, "CBF changes associated with focal ischemic preconditioning in the spontaneously hypertensive rat", J CEREB BLOOD FLOW METAB., (200609), vol. 26, no. 9, pages 1128 - 40 | - KAWAHARA N; RUETZLER CA, "Klatzo . Protective effect of spreading depression against neuronal damage following cardiac arrest cerebral ischaemia", NEUROL RES., (199502), vol. 17, no. 1, pages 9 - 16 | - TAGA K; PATEL PM; DRUMMOND JC; COLE DJ; KELLY PJ, "Transient neuronal depolarization induces tolerance to subsequent forebrain ischemia in rats", ANESTHESIOLOGY, (199710), vol. 87, no. 4, pages 918 - 25 | - DOUEN AG; AKIYAMA K; HOGAN MJ; WANG F; DONG L; CHOW AK; HAKIM A, "Preconditioning with cortical spreading depression decreases intraischemic cerebral glutamate levels and down- regulates excitatory amino acid transporters EAAT1 and EAAT2 from rat cerebal cortex plasma membranes", J NEUROCHEM., (200008), vol. 75, no. 2, pages 812 - 8 | - LAI AY; TODD KG, "Microglia in cerebral ischemia: molecular actions and interactions", CAN J PHYSIOL PHARMACOL., (200601), vol. 84, no. 1, pages 49 - 59 | - MABUCHI T; KITAGAWA K; OHTSUKI T; KUWABARA K; YAGITA Y; YANAGIHARA T; HORI M; MATSUMOTO M, CONTRIBUTION OF MICROGLIA/MACROPHAGES TO EXPANSION OF INFARCTION AND RESPONSE OF OLIGODENDROCYTES AFTER FOCAL CEREBRAL ISCHEMIA IN RATS, (200007), vol. 31, no. 7, pages 1735 - 43 | US20000695934 |