EP2327591 - Personalisation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.2013 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/22] | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Gunnar Kapellenweg 15 78052, Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | 02 /
Scholten, Lutz Nizzaallee 40 52072, Aachen / DE | [2011/22] | Application number, filing date | 10192726.7 | 26.11.2010 | [2011/22] | Priority number, date | DE20091055963 | 27.11.2009 Original published format: DE102009055963 | [2011/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2327591 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2327591 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/037, G07C5/00 | [2012/37] | CPC: |
B60R16/037 (EP);
G07C2209/04 (EP);
G07C5/0858 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/22] | B60R16/037 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Personalisierungseinrichtung | [2011/22] | English: | Personalisation device | [2011/22] | French: | Dispositif de personnalisation | [2011/22] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/38] | 25.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4477874 (IKUTA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,6 * figure 2 ** column 2, lines 10-40 *; | [XI]WO2007004984 (SCANIA CV ABP [SE], et al) [X] 2-5,7 * figure 1 * * page 2, line 30 - page 44, line 29 * * page 5, line 10 - page 11, line 20 * [I] 1,6; | [X]DE102007058163 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [X] 2 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 12] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0058] * * figure 1 * |