EP2457648 - Production of fatty acid alkyl esters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yellow Diesel B.V. Roetersstraat 35 1018 WB Amsterdam / NL | [2012/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dimian, Alexandre C. Else Mauhstraat 4 1183 EC Amstelveen / NL | 02 /
Rothenberg, Gadi Hugo de Vrieslaan 97 2341 NV Oegstgeest / NL | 03 /
Schut, Ronald Max Havelaarlaan 163 1183 LP Amsterdam / NL | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [2012/22] | Application number, filing date | 10192974.3 | 29.11.2010 | [2012/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2457648 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/04, C11C3/00 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
B01J8/0457 (EP);
C07C67/03 (EP);
C10L1/026 (EP);
C10L1/19 (EP);
C11C3/003 (EP);
B01J2208/00212 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C07C67/03, C07C69/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Herstellung von Fettsäurealkylestern | [2012/22] | English: | Production of fatty acid alkyl esters | [2012/22] | French: | Production d'esters d'alkyl d'acide gras | [2012/22] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/23] | 11.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US7741501 (WUERKERT STEPHAN [DE], et al) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 5 * * figures 2, 6, 8; claims 1, 10 *; | [AD]US7151187 (DELFORT BRUNO [FR], et al) [AD] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]EP1884559 (VITO [BE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | by applicant | US7151187 |