EP2457608 - Medicated module and syringe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mercer, David Richard 18 Gas Street , Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV31 3BY / GB | 02 /
Kouyoumjian, Garen 2A Plymouth Place , Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV31 1HN / GB | 03 /
Boyd, Malcolm Stanley 28 Whitehead Drive, Wellesbourne Warwickshire CV35 9PW / GB | 04 /
De Sausmarez Lintell, Daniel Thomas 6 Smithy lane Church Lawford, Rugby Warwickshire CV23 9EQ / GB | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/22] | Application number, filing date | 10192985.9 | 29.11.2010 | [2012/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2457608 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/24, A61M5/32 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
A61M5/2448 (EP);
A61M5/326 (EP);
A61M2005/1787 (EP);
A61M2005/3247 (EP);
A61M2005/3267 (EP);
A61M2205/581 (EP);
A61M2205/584 (EP);
A61M2205/6045 (EP);
A61M5/2466 (EP);
A61M5/3146 (EP);
A61M5/3272 (EP);
A61M5/3294 (EP);
A61M5/347 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Medizinisches Modul und Spritze | [2012/22] | English: | Medicated module and syringe | [2012/22] | French: | Module médicalisé et seringue | [2012/22] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR2210910 (LABLABO [FR]) [X] 1-7,10,11,15 * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 8; figure - * [Y] 8,9,12-14; | [X]WO8802265 (MERIEUX INST [FR]) [X] 1-15 * page 6, line 1 - page 8, line 3; figure - *; | [Y]WO0176665 (B D MEDICO S A R L [CH], et al) [Y] 8,9,12-14* abstract *; | [XY]US6562002 (TAYLOR MICHAEL A [US]) [X] 1-7,10,11,15 * column 7; figures 1-6,8 * * column 8, line 44 - column 9, line 16; figure 7 * [Y] 8,9,12-14; | [XY]US2006276755 (SULLIVAN VINCENT J [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10,11,15 * paragraphs [0030] - [0031] - [0036] , [0042] , [0043]; figure - * [Y] 8,9,12-14; | [X]US2009018506 (DAILY DAVID [IL], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0126] - [0134] - [0165] - [0173]; figures 1-60 *; | [Y]WO2010019936 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US], et al) [Y] 8,9,12-14 * page 8, lines 8-18; figure - * |