EP2338616 - Mechanical support strip cleaner for cleaning support strips of work piece supports on machine tools [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trumpf Grüsch AG Ausserfeld 7214 Grüsch / CH | [2011/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Janutin, Andreas Dreibündenstrasse 82 7000, Chur / CH | 02 /
Dubler, Peter Via Pastira 24 7138, Surcuolm / CH | 03 /
Böhringer, Claus Castelatweg 2 7206, Igis / CH | [2016/37] |
Former [2011/26] | 01 /
Janutin, Andreas Dreibündenstrasse 82 7000, Chur / CH | ||
02 /
Peter, Dubler Via Pastira 24 7138, Surcuolm / CH | |||
03 /
Claus, Böhringer Castelatweg 2 7206, Igis / CH | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/37] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Ruppmannstraße 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2011/26] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstraße 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 10193124.4 | 30.11.2010 | [2011/26] | Priority number, date | DE20091060137 | 23.12.2009 Original published format: DE102009060137 | [2011/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2338616 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2338616 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2338616 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B08B1/00, B08B1/02, B08B1/04, B08B7/02, B23K26/10, B23K26/70 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
B08B1/12 (EP);
B23K37/0211 (KR);
B08B1/00 (KR,US);
B08B1/165 (EP);
B08B1/20 (EP,KR,US);
B08B1/30 (EP,KR,US);
B08B1/32 (KR,US);
B08B1/34 (EP);
B08B7/02 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/43] | B08B1/00, B08B1/04, B23K26/16 | ||
Former IPC [2011/26] | B08B1/00, B23K26/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/37] |
Former [2011/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Maschineller Auflageleisten-Reiniger zum Reinigen von Auflageleisten von Werkstückauflagen an Werkzeugmaschinen | [2011/26] | English: | Mechanical support strip cleaner for cleaning support strips of work piece supports on machine tools | [2011/26] | French: | Dispositif mécanique pour le nettoyage de barres d'appui de supports de pièces à usiner sur des machines-outils | [2011/26] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 11.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.11.2010 | AL | 14.09.2016 | CY | 14.09.2016 | DK | 14.09.2016 | EE | 14.09.2016 | ES | 14.09.2016 | FI | 14.09.2016 | HR | 14.09.2016 | LT | 14.09.2016 | LV | 14.09.2016 | MC | 14.09.2016 | MK | 14.09.2016 | MT | 14.09.2016 | NL | 14.09.2016 | PL | 14.09.2016 | RO | 14.09.2016 | RS | 14.09.2016 | SE | 14.09.2016 | SI | 14.09.2016 | SK | 14.09.2016 | SM | 14.09.2016 | TR | 14.09.2016 | AT | 30.11.2016 | BE | 30.11.2016 | IE | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | BG | 14.12.2016 | NO | 14.12.2016 | GR | 15.12.2016 | IS | 14.01.2017 | PT | 16.01.2017 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 30.11.2010 | |
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MK | 14.09.2016 | ||
MT | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
TR | 14.09.2016 | ||
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 30.11.2010 | |
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MK | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
TR | 14.09.2016 | ||
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.11.2010 | |
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MK | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | DK | 14.09.2016 | |
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | DK | 14.09.2016 | |
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | DK | 14.09.2016 | |
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | DK | 14.09.2016 | |
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | EE | 14.09.2016 | |
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 14.09.2016 | |
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 14.09.2016 | |
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 14.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4427910 (BAHNEMANN MANFRED RECYCLING [DE]); | [A]US6033522 (IWATA TETSUYA [JP], et al); | [XDA]WO2004043638 (WELAND AB [SE], et al); | [XA]WO2005077552 (THUET JEAN-PAUL [FR]); | [A]DE202004015922U (TRUMPF GRUESCH AG GRUESCH [CH]); | [XA]DE102004060085 (FRANZ HOF GMBH [DE]) | Examination | US3641618 | US5482562 | EP2082813 | by applicant | WO2004043638 |