EP2457863 - Lifting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Encasa S.r.l. Via S. Cannizzaro 2 56121 Pisa / IT | [2012/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sbrana, Fabio Via Tosco Romagnola n° 1375 56023 Cascina Pisa / IT | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/04] |
Former [2012/22] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 10193161.6 | 30.11.2010 | [2012/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2457863 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2457863 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B66B11/02, B66B9/02 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
B66B11/0226 (EP);
B66B9/027 (EP);
Y02B50/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/04] |
Former [2012/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Hebevorrichtung | [2012/22] | English: | Lifting device | [2012/22] | French: | Dispositif de levage | [2012/22] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 29.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 19.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/01] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 19.11.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 19.11.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.12.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.11.2010 | AL | 27.01.2016 | AT | 27.01.2016 | BE | 27.01.2016 | CY | 27.01.2016 | CZ | 27.01.2016 | EE | 27.01.2016 | FI | 27.01.2016 | GR | 27.01.2016 | HR | 27.01.2016 | IT | 27.01.2016 | LT | 27.01.2016 | LV | 27.01.2016 | MC | 27.01.2016 | MK | 27.01.2016 | NL | 27.01.2016 | PL | 27.01.2016 | RO | 27.01.2016 | RS | 27.01.2016 | SI | 27.01.2016 | SK | 27.01.2016 | SM | 27.01.2016 | TR | 27.01.2016 | BG | 27.04.2016 | NO | 27.04.2016 | IS | 27.05.2016 | PT | 27.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 30.11.2010 | |
AT | 27.01.2016 | ||
BE | 27.01.2016 | ||
CY | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
GR | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
MC | 27.01.2016 | ||
MK | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
TR | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.11.2010 | |
AT | 27.01.2016 | ||
BE | 27.01.2016 | ||
CY | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
GR | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
MC | 27.01.2016 | ||
MK | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
BE | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
BE | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 27.01.2016 | |
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 27.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]DE2227125 (JACOBS MAX) [X] 1,12,13 * figures 8-12 * [A] 6,7,9-11 [Y] 2-5,8 [I] 15; | [Y]EP0041628 (WASSERMANN FRANZ) [Y] 2,4,5,8 * page 7, lines 9-12; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP1182163 (DYNATECH DYNAMICS & TECHNOLOGY [ES]) [Y] 3 * figure 4 *; | [X]US6591945 (KIGAWA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US1348138 (JOHN HUNT) [A] 4-11 * figure 3 * | Examination | JP2001261268 |