EP2330369 - Heat exchange and waste heat recovery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Wataru c/o Honda Engineering Co., Ltd. 6-1, Hagadai, Hagamachi, Hagagun Tochigi / JP | [2011/23] | Representative(s) | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10193504.7 | 02.12.2010 | [2011/23] | Priority number, date | JP20090277835 | 07.12.2009 Original published format: JP 2009277835 | JP20090277852 | 07.12.2009 Original published format: JP 2009277852 | [2011/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2330369 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F26B15/12, // F26B23/00 | [2011/23] | CPC: |
F26B15/12 (EP,US);
F26B15/04 (EP,US);
F26B23/007 (EP,US);
F28D21/0014 (EP,US);
F26B2210/12 (EP,US);
Y02P70/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wärmeaustausch und Abwärmerückgewinnung | [2011/23] | English: | Heat exchange and waste heat recovery | [2011/23] | French: | Échange thermique et récupération de chaleur des déchets | [2011/23] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 25.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/02] | 23.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2011 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE102007062266 (WURSTER GERD [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0009]; figures 2-4 * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraphs [0033] , [0034] , [0038] * * paragraphs [0047] , [0048] , [0050] , [0051] , [0063] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0074] * [I] 3,5; | [XA]US2884707 (JONAS SANDBACK) [X] 4 * column 1, line 15; figures 3,6,7 * * column 2, line 47 - line 53 * * column 2, line 68 - column 3, line 3 * * column 4, line 25 - line 54 * [A] 5; | [A]US5144754 (PERSSON ANDERS [SE]) [A] 1,3-5 * page 1, line 6 - line 16; figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 28 - line 43 * * column 3, line 53 - line 66 * * column 7, line 4 - line 7 * | by applicant | JPH08150365 |